Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/17/2018 at 19:15:07 (UTC).

ABRAMOVITZ VS AYALA

Case Summary

On 07/09/2015 ABRAMOVITZ filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against AYALA. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0944

  • Filing Date:

    07/09/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ABRAMOVITZ, J. L.

Defendant

AYALA, OFELIA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/12/2015
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Clerk Default Judgment Before Trial (CL/CV); Unlawful Detainer: Awarded To: ABRAMOVITZ, J. L.; Entitled to Possession of Premises at: 1708 PACIFIC STREET, #7, BAKERSFIELD, CA 93305; Judgment Applies to All Occupants; The Rental Agreement Is Cancelled; The Lease Is Forfeited; Awarded Against: AYALA, OFELIA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2015
  • Order to Show Cause - Local Rule 3.15.1(c) - Judicial Officer(s): Etienne, Linda S., Copelan, James B.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2015
  • Writ of Possession Issued - Comment: Returned via AMS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2015
  • Application for Issuance of Writ of Possession; Affidavit - Comment: of Daily Rental Value Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2015
  • Rejection/Correction Notice - Comment: Application for writ rejected: Plaintiff name does not conform to complaint.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2015
  • Judgment (Clerk's Default/Restitution Only) Filed & Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2015
  • Request for Entry of Default and Clerks Judgment - Comment: As to All uknown occupants and Default entered on 07/28/15.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2015
  • Request For Entry of Default Not Entered - Comment: For the Following Reason(s):Date of previously entered default does not conform.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2015
  • Request for Entry of Default by Clerk Entered - Comment: As to Ofelia Ayala.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2015
  • Proof of Service - Comment: As to Ofelia Ayala.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2015
  • Proof of Service - Comment: As to All unknown occupants.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2015
  • Civil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: ABRAMOVITZ, J. L.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2015
  • Address and Zip Code of Unlawfully Detained Property - Comment: 1708 PACIFIC STREET #7 BAKERSFIELD, CA 93305

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2015
  • Notice of Commencement of Unlawful Detainer Action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2015
  • Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: Local Rule 3.15.1(c)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2015
  • Summons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2015
  • Complaint - Unlawful Detainer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2015
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less