This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/01/2020 at 22:49:54 (UTC).

ABOVE ALL PROPERTY MANAGEMENT, LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY VS WALKER

Case Summary

On 03/20/2017 ABOVE ALL PROPERTY MANAGEMENT, LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against WALKER. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Bittleston, Dawn and Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1447

  • Filing Date:

    03/20/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Bittleston, Dawn

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ABOVE ALL PROPERTY MANAGEMENT, LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Defendant

WALKER, CURNESHA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KUMMER, DIXON G

 

Court Documents

Unlawful Detainer Trial (Court)

Unlawful Detainer Trial (Court) 04/18/2017: Judicial Officer: Bittleston, Dawn; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Judgment; Comment: ANSWER FILED BY CURNESHA WALKER. TIME ESTIMATE 15 MINS.; Parties Present Plaintiff: ABOVE ALL PROPERTY MANAGEMENT, LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY; Attorney: KUMMER, DIXON G

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/21/2017
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Local Rule 3.15.1(c) - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2017
  • DocketWrit of Execution Issued - Comment: Money & Possession/Kern/Tri Star

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2017
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Court Finding After Court Trial (CL/CV); Unlawful Detainer: Awarded To: ABOVE ALL PROPERTY MANAGEMENT, LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY; Entitled to Possession of Premises at: 505 Goodman St Unit B Bakersfield CA 93305; Judgment Applies to All Occupants; The Rental Agreement Is Cancelled; The Lease Is Forfeited; Awarded Against: WALKER, CURNESHA; Must Pay; Past Due Rent: $3,650.00; Holdover Damages: $405.00; Attorney Fees: $500.00; Costs: $265.00; Total: $4,820.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2017
  • DocketJudgment after Trial - Judicial Officer: Bittleston, Dawn; Comment: Returned via Tri Star

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2017
  • DocketMemorandum of Costs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUnlawful Detainer Trial (Court) - Unlawful Detainer Trial (Court) 04/18/2017: Judicial Officer: Bittleston, Dawn; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Judgment; Comment: ANSWER FILED BY CURNESHA WALKER. TIME ESTIMATE 15 MINS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2017
  • DocketNotice of Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2017
  • DocketInitial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted - Comment: by clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • DocketRequest/Counter Request to Set Case for Trial (UD)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2017
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2017
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: Curnesha Walker

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2017
  • DocketAnswer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2017
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: ABOVE ALL PROPERTY MANAGEMENT, LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY; Served: 03/22/201712:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: Local Rule 3.15.1(c)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • DocketNotice of Commencement of Unlawful Detainer Action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • DocketAddress and Zip Code of Unlawfully Detained Property - Comment: 505 GOODMAN STREET, UNIT #B BAKERSFIELD, CA 93305 KERN COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • DocketComplaint - Unlawful Detainer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.