This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 05/13/2020 at 07:19:22 (UTC).

ABOUTALEB VS BENNETT

Case Summary

On 02/13/2020 ABOUTALEB filed a Family - Harassment lawsuit against BENNETT. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Mojave Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Green, Kenneth R., Jr. and Webster, Jason W.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0021

  • Filing Date:

    02/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Harassment

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Mojave Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Green, Kenneth R., Jr.

Webster, Jason W.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

ABOUTALEB, AHMED

Respondent

BENNETT, MONTY

 

Court Documents

Petition for Harassment

Petition for Harassment 02/27/2020: Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Dismissed

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/27/2020
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Entry of Request for Dismissal-Before Trial(CL/CV); Party: Names: ABOUTALEB, AHMED; BENNETT, MONTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition for Harassment - Petition for Harassment 02/27/2020: Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Dismissed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • DocketResponse to Request for Civil Restraining Order (CH-120) - Comment: ----- FILED ON DEMAND -----

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: FOR MONTY BENNETT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service (CH-200) - Comment: As to Monty Bennett.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketNotice of Court Hearing (CH-109) - Judicial Officer: Webster, Jason W.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: ABOUTALEB, AHMED; Served: 02/18/20202:00 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order (CH-110) - Judicial Officer: Webster, Jason W.; Comment: Partly granted partly denied.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketRequest for Civil Harassment Restraining Orders (CH-100)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketConfidential Document - Comment: Memo to judge.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketConfidential Document - Comment: CLETS

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.