This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/01/2020 at 23:49:07 (UTC).

ABARCA VS ABARCA (D)

Case Summary

On 03/30/2017 ABARCA filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against ABARCA D. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Bittleston, Dawn, Gill, Susan M. and Benavides, Jose R.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2025

  • Filing Date:

    03/30/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Bittleston, Dawn

Gill, Susan M.

Benavides, Jose R.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

ABARCA, BRANDON

Respondent

ABARCA, JASMINE

 

Court Documents

Request for Order - Respondent

Request for Order - Respondent 04/02/2018: Judicial Officer: Benavides, Jose R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 02/26/18 RES MOD C/V 1 MINOR 16COURT--14COURT

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice:

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: PROOF OF SERVICE: WRONG FORM, MISSING CASE NUMBER

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/02/2018
  • DocketMediation Agreement and Order - Judicial Officer: Benavides, Jose R.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Order - Respondent - Request for Order - Respondent 04/02/2018: Judicial Officer: Benavides, Jose R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 02/26/18 RES MOD C/V 1 MINOR 16COURT--14COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2018
  • DocketMediation Appointment - Hearing Time: 1:15 PM; Result: Mediation; Comment: SET BY MOTHER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2018
  • DocketProof of Personal Service - Comment: HRG 4/02/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2018
  • DocketRequest for Order with Court Order (FL-300) - Comment: HRG 04/02/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2018
  • DocketInitial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2018
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2018
  • DocketEx Parte Application and Order to Restore Name - Judicial Officer: Gill, Susan M.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2018
  • DocketChild Support Registry Received for Forwarding to SDU

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2018
  • DocketChild Support Registry Received for Forwarding to SDU

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 12/13/2017
  • DocketDeclaration Re Service of Prelim Declaration of Disclosure - Comment: RESPONDENTS PRELIMINARY DISCLOSURES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2017
  • DocketStipulation for Waiver of Final Declaration of Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2017
  • DocketAffidavit - Paralegal / Typing Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2017
  • DocketDeclaration Re Service of Prelim Declaration of Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2017
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: PROOF OF SERVICE: WRONG FORM, MISSING CASE NUMBER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • DocketAffidavit - Paralegal / Typing Service - Comment: DIVORCE CITY 911

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • DocketPetition for Dissolution of Marriage

    Read MoreRead Less