This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/28/2020 at 17:23:08 (UTC).

ABACA BAIL BONDS VS HERRERA

Case Summary

On 05/23/2013 ABACA BAIL BONDS filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against HERRERA. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Kern County Metropolitan Division located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********6993

  • Filing Date:

    05/23/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ABACA BAIL BONDS

Defendants

MEJIA HERRERA, VICTORIA

HERRERA, BEATRICE MARIE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/16/2015
  • DocketMemo of Costs / Accrued Interest

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2014
  • DocketAbstract Issued - Comment: FILED BY: ABACA BAIL BONDS RETURNED VIA ADVANCED LEGAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/11/2014
  • Docket117B Pmt: Abstract Issued GC 70626(A)(2) EFF 7/28/09 - Comment: Amount of $25.00 for ABACA BAIL BONDS (PL-1). Received from ABACA BAIL BONDS, check no(s) 5057. Receipt #783180 for amount of $25.00.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2014
  • DocketMail Returned Undelivered - Comment: NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT AS TO BEATRICE MARIE HERRERA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2014
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment Mailed to All Parties - Comment: Document Image

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2014
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: OF DEFAULT IN PAYMENTS AS TO VICTORIA MEJIA HERRER AND BEATRICE MARIE HERRERA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2014
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Comment: AS TO ABACA BAIL BONDS, RETURNED PRO PER *A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2014
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Comment: TO: ABACA BAIL BONDS 518 CHESTER. AVE BAKERSFIELD, CA 93301 RE: ABACA BAIL BONDS VS HERRERA Case No. S-1500-CS-186993, LSE NOTICE OF REJECTION / REQUEST FOR CORRECTIONS The attached DECLARATION OF DEFAULT IN PAYMENTS papers are being returned for the following reason(s): Default cannot be entered. Reason: DECLARATION STATES MEDIATED AGREEMENT WAS ENTERED INTO ON 11/14/2013. THE MEDIATED AGREEMENT WAS NOT ENTERED INTO ON THIS DATE. ANY CORRESPONDENCE REQUIRING AN ANSWER FROM THE COURT MUST BE ACCOMPANIED BY A STAMPED, SELF ADDRESSED ENVELOPE. Calendar Notes: TO: ABACA BAIL BONDS 518 CHESTER. AVE BAKERSFIELD, CA 93301 RE: ABACA BAIL BONDS VS HERRERA Case No. S-1500-CS-186993, LSE NOTICE OF REJECTION / REQUEST FOR CORRECTIONS The attached DECLARATION OF DEFAULT IN PAYMENTS papers are being returned for the following reason(s): Default cannot be entered. Reason: DECLARATION STATES MEDIATED AGREEMENT WAS ENTERED INTO ON 11/14/2013. THE MEDIATED AGREEMENT WAS NOT ENTERED INTO ON THIS DATE. ANY CORRESPONDENCE REQUIRING AN ANSWER FROM THE COURT MUST BE ACCOMPANIED BY A STAMPED, SELF ADDRESSED ENVELOPE.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2013
  • DocketMediation Agreement and Order - Comment: Document Image

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2013
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear (Small Claims) - Comment: AS TO BARBARA HILL FOR ABACA BAIL BONDS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 08/26/2013
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: AS TO VICTORIA MEJIA HERRERA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/20/2013
  • DocketHearing Vacated - Comment: CONTINUED AT THE REQUEST OF THE PLAINTIFF IN ORDER TO SERVE THE DEFENDANT. ~ calid=2306984 Vacating calendar hearing. EventCode:4150, CourtDate:08/28/2013, Courtroom:12, SessionNumber:1, Sequence:0, SessionType:SCT, Judge:LSE, Deputy:griceldae, SystemDate:7/25/2013 10:04:04 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2013
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: OF PLAINTIFF REQUESTING CONTINUANCE IN ORDER TO SERVE DEFENDANT.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2013
  • DocketSmall Claims Trial - Original Type: Small Claims Trial; Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 09:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Deleted in Class Act; Result: CONV; Comment:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2013
  • DocketHearing Vacated - Comment: CONTINUANCE REQUESTED ~ calid=2269932 Vacating calendar hearing. EventCode:4150, CourtDate:07/29/2013, Courtroom:12, SessionNumber:1, Sequence:0, SessionType:SCT, Judge:LSE, Deputy:ARACELIW, SystemDate:6/11/2013 4:07:20 PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2013
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: FILED BY ABACA BAIL BONDS. REQUESTING 30 DAYS EXTENSION IN ORDER TO SERVE DEFENDANTS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2013
  • Docket854D Pmt: Small Claims Filing Fee > 12 Claims in 12 Months - Comment: Amount of $100.00 for ABACA BAIL BONDS (PL-1). Received from ABACA BAIL BONDS, check no(s) 1816. Receipt #721406 for amount of $100.00.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2013
  • DocketCONV - Comment: New case created by deputy: 678

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2013
  • DocketFictitious Business Name Declaration (Small Claims) - Comment: AS TO ABACA BAIL BONDS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2013
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Defendant - Comment: ENDORSED COPIES IN PRO PER BIN "A"

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less