This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/27/2020 at 23:34:04 (UTC).

ABACA BAIL BONDS VS BYRD

Case Summary

On 11/13/2012 ABACA BAIL BONDS filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against BYRD. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Kern County Metropolitan Division located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********5888

  • Filing Date:

    11/13/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ABACA BAIL BONDS

Defendants

BYRD, RANDY PERRY

SPENCER, KAREN DENISE

DAVIDSON, JACOB MICHAEL

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/25/2019
  • DocketWrit Returned Unsatisfied

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • DocketMemorandum of Costs

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2016
  • DocketConfidential Statement - Comment: OF JUDGMENT DEBTORS SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER; JACOB MICHAEL DAVIDSON

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2016
  • DocketMail Returned Undelivered - Comment: AS TO RANDY PERRY BYRD - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2016
  • DocketWrit of Execution Issued - Comment: KERN COUNTY RETURNED VIA PICK UP BIN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2016
  • DocketMemorandum of Credits, Interest and Costs Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2016
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Comment: re: writ of execution/returned via abaca bail bonds

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2016
  • DocketMail Returned Undelivered - Comment: CORRE CTED NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT AS TO JACOB MICHAEL DAVIDSON

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2016
  • DocketMail Returned Undelivered - Comment: ORDER ON REQUEST TO CORRECT OR CANCEL JUDGMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2016
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment Mailed to All Parties - Comment: (Small Claims) CORRECTED PER ORDER ON 6/16/2016.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 01/24/2013
  • DocketNP1500 - Comment: Department: 12 Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: TRIAL BY COURT. DISPOSED AFTER COURT TRIAL, BEFORE EVIDENCE BY BOTH SIDES (STATISTICAL PURPOSES ONLY). THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: BARBARA HILL APPEARS AS REPRESENTATIVE FOR ABACA BAIL BONDS. NO APPEARANCE BY DEFENDANTS *************************************************************************************** BARBARA HILL DULY SWORN AND TESTIFIES ON BEHALF OF THE PLAINTIFF. EVIDENCE PRESENTED BY PLAINTIFF. THE COURT MAKES THE FOLLOWING FINDINGS AND ORDERS: JUDGMENT FOR PLAINTIFF AGAINST DEFENDANTS FOR PRINCIPAL $2,999.15 PLUS COURT COSTS OF $137.50. CONTRACT CANCELED AND RETURNED TO PLAINTIFF.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2013
  • Docket4150 Small Claims Trial - Comment: Hearing Entered. Calendar Notes: other defendant: Jacob M. Davidson2,999.1550.00/ 35*2+17.50=87.50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2013
  • DocketSmall Claims Trial - Original Type: Small Claims Trial; Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 09:30 AM; Result: CONV; Comment: other defendant: Jacob M. Davidson2,999.1550.00/ 35*2+17.50=87.50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2012
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: AS TO KAREN DENISE SPENCER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2012
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: AS TO RANDY PERRY BYRD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2012
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: AS TO JACOB MICHAEL DAVIDSON

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2012
  • Docket854D Pmt: Small Claims Filing Fee > 12 Claims in 12 Months - Comment: Amount of $100.00 for ABACA BAIL BONDS (PL-1). Received from ABACA BAIL BONDS, check no(s) 1593. Receipt #688198 for amount of $100.00.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2012
  • DocketCONV - Comment: New case created by deputy: 790

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/13/2012
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Defendant - Comment: ENDORSED COPIES RETURNED VIA PRO PER BIN "A"

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/13/2012
  • DocketFictitious Business Name Declaration (Small Claims) - Comment: Document Image

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less