This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/11/2020 at 23:51:50 (UTC).

A. WHITE VS. GARCIA & GARCIA

Case Summary

On 05/24/2011 A WHITE filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against GARCIA GARCIA. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Arvin / Lamont Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Witt, Gary R.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6584

  • Filing Date:

    05/24/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Witt, Gary R.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

A. WHITE, INC, ASSIGNED TO COLLECTIBLES MANAGEMENT RESOURCES

Defendants

GARCIA, JASMIN

GARCIA, JOSEFINA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/09/2017
  • DocketWrit Returned Unsatisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2012
  • Docket115B Pmt: Writs Issued 70626(A)(1) EFF 7/28/09 - Comment: Amount of $25.00 for A. WHITE, INC, ASSIGNED TO COLLECTIBLES MANAGEM... (PL-1). Received from COLLECTIBLES MANAGEMENT, check no(s) 41269. Receipt #655094 for amount of $25.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2012
  • DocketWrit of Execution Issued - Comment: COUNTY: KERN ISSUED: 5/11/2012

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2012
  • DocketMemo of Costs / Accrued Interest - Comment: ACCRUED INTEREST: $116.90

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2012
  • Docket117B Pmt: Abstract Issued GC 70626(A)(2) EFF 7/28/09 - Comment: Amount of $25.00 for A. WHITE, INC, ASSIGNED TO COLLECTIBLES MANAGEM... (PL-1). Received from COLLECTIBLES MANAGEMENT, check no(s) 40938. Receipt #648394 for amount of $25.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2012
  • DocketAbstract Issued - Comment: ISSUED: 4/5/2012 TOTAL: $2,561.56

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2012
  • DocketAssignment of Judgment - Comment: NEWLY ASSIGNED TO: COLLECTIBLES MANAGEMENT RESOURCES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2012
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorneys - Comment: OLD ATTORNEY: SANDRA KUHN MCCORMACK NEW ATTORNEY: COLLECTIBLES MANAGEMENT RESOURCES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2012
  • DocketRejection/Correction Form - Comment: ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT AND SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY SENT TO CORRECT COURT ADDRESS AND CASE NUMBER ON EACH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2011
  • DocketJudgment by Default by Court - Comment: TOTAL: $2561.56 AS TO: JOSEFINA GARCIA & JASMIN GARCIA SIGNED BY: JUDGE LARRY A. ERRERA DATE: 11/23/11

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 06/09/2011
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: WHAT SERVED: SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, UNLAWFUL DETAINER WHO SERVED: JOSEFINA GARCIA HOW SERVED: PERSONAL SERVICE DATE SERVED: 05/24/11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2011
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons - Comment: WHAT SERVED: SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, UNLAWFUL DETAINER WHO SERVED: JASMIN GARCIA HOW SERVED: 05/24/11 DATE SERVED: PERSONAL SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2011
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons - Comment: WHAT SERVED: SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, UNLAWFUL DETAINER WHO SERVED: UNLAWFUL DETAINER AND PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION HOW SERVED: UKNOWN TENANT-ANYONE CLAIMING ANY RIGHT TO OCCUPANCY DATE SERVED: 05/24/11 MAILED THEREAFTER ON 05/24/11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2011
  • DocketNotice of Commencement of Unlawful Detainer Action - Comment: NOTICE OF COMMENCEMENT OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER ACTION An Unlawful Detainer Complaint (eviction action) has been filed naming you as a defendant. ACCESS TO THE COURT FILE WILL BE DELAYED FOR 60 DAYS EXCEPT TO A PARTY, AN ATTORNEY FOR ONE OF THE PARTIES, OR ANY PERSON WHO; (1) PROVIDES TO THE CLERK THE NAMES OF AT LEAST ONE PLAINTIFF AND ONE DEFENDANT IN THE ACTION AND PROVIDES TO THE CLERK THE ADDRESS, INCLUDING ANY APPLICABLE APARTMENT, UNIT OR SPACE NUMBER, OF THE SUBJECT PREMISES OR, (2) PROVIDES TO THE CLERK THE NAME OF ONE OF THE PARTIES IN THE ACTION OR THE CASE NUMBER AND CAN ESTABLISH THROUGH PROPER IDENTIFICATION THAT HE OR SHE LIVES IN THE SUBJECT PREMISES. ACCESS TO THE COURT INDEX, REGISTER OF ACTIONS, OR OTHER RECORDS IS NOT PERMITTED UNTIL 60 DAYS AFTER THE COMPLAINT IS FILED EXCEPT PURSUANT TO AN EXPARTE ORDER UPON SHOWING OF GOOD CAUSE THEREFORE... (SECTION 1161.2 CCP) THE ABOVE RESTRICTIONS DO NOT, HOWEVER, AFFECT OR ALTER YOUR RIGHTS OR RESPONSIBILITIES TO RESPOND TO THIS ACTION WITHIN THE TIMES PRESCRIBED BY LAW. ______________________________________________________________ FOR ADDITIONAL INFORMATION YOU MAY CONTACT THE GREATER BAKERSFIELD LEGAL ASSISTANCE, INC. AT (661) 325-5943 LOCATED AT 615 CALIFORNIA AVENUE, BAKERSFIELD, CA 93304. FOR SELF HELP INFORMATION YOU MAY CONTACT THE KERN COUNTY LAW LIBRARY AND SELF HELP CENTER AT (661) 868-2532 LOCATED AT 1415 TRUXTUN AVENUE, 3RD FLOOR, BAKERSFIELD, CA 93301. OUTSIDE OF BAKERSFIELD YOU MAY CONTACT THE CALIFORNIA RURAL LEGAL ASSISTANCE AT (661) 725-4350 LOCATED AT 629 MAIN STREET, DELANO, CA 93215. Calendar Notes: NOTICE OF COMMENCEMENT OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER ACTION An Unlawful Detainer Complaint (eviction action) has been filed naming you as a defendant. ACCESS TO THE COURT FILE WILL BE DELAYED FOR 60 DAYS EXCEPT TO A PARTY, AN ATTORNEY FOR ONE OF THE PARTIES, OR ANY PERSON WHO; (1) PROVIDES TO THE CLERK THE NAMES OF AT LEAST ONE PLAINTIFF AND ONE DEFENDANT IN THE ACTION AND PROVIDES TO THE CLERK THE ADDRESS, INCLUDING ANY APPLICABLE APARTMENT, UNIT OR SPACE NUMBER, OF THE SUBJECT PREMISES OR, (2) PROVIDES TO THE CLERK THE NAME OF ONE OF THE PARTIES IN THE ACTION OR THE CASE NUMBER AND CAN ESTABLISH THROUGH PROPER IDENTIFICATION THAT HE OR SHE LIVES IN THE SUBJECT PREMISES. ACCESS TO THE COURT INDEX, REGISTER OF ACTIONS, OR OTHER RECORDS IS NOT PERMITTED UNTIL 60 DAYS AFTER THE COMPLAINT IS FILED EXCEPT PURSUANT TO AN EXPARTE ORDER UPON SHOWING OF GOOD CAUSE THEREFORE... (SECTION 1161.2 CCP) THE ABOVE RESTRICTIONS DO NOT, HOWEVER, AFFECT OR ALTER YOUR RIGHTS OR RESPONSIBILITIES TO RESPOND TO THIS ACTION WITHIN THE TIMES PRESCRIBED BY LAW. ______________________________________________________________ FOR ADDITIONAL INFORMATION YOU MAY CONTACT THE GREATER BAKERSFIELD LEGAL ASSISTANCE, INC. AT (661) 325-5943 LOCATED AT 615 CALIFORNIA AVENUE, BAKERSFIELD, CA 93304. FOR SELF HELP INFORMATION YOU MAY CONTACT THE KERN COUNTY LAW LIBRARY AND SELF HELP CENTER AT (661) 868-2532 LOCATED AT 1415 TRUXTUN AVENUE, 3RD FLOOR, BAKERSFIELD, CA 93301. OUTSIDE OF BAKERSFIELD YOU MAY CONTACT THE CALIFORNIA RURAL LEGAL ASSISTANCE AT (661) 725-4350 LOCATED AT 629 MAIN STREET, DELANO, CA 93215.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2011
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.15.1(c) - Comment: NOTICE OF ORDER TO APPEAR AND SHOW CAUSE WHY THIS MATTER SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED RE: LOCAL RULE 3.17.1(C) TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S ATTORNEY OF RECORD, IF ANY: YOU AND EACH OF YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR BEFORE THE COURT ON Sep 01, 2011 AT 1:30 PM IN DEPARTMENT AL OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT, then and there to show cause, if any you have, why this matter should not be dismissed. All appearances are mandatory, unless five (5) court days prior to hearing date the court has received an answer or other responsive pleading, an amended complaint converting the action to an ordinary civil action, a request for entry of default, a request for dismissal, a stipulated judgment or stipulation for entry of judgment or a notice of settlement, then no appearance is necessary. WARNING! IF YOU FAIL TO APPEAR AS ORDERED HEREIN, THIS ACTION WILL BE DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE (C.C.P. 575.2). Date: ________________________ ____________________________________ GARY R WITT Judge of the Superior Court SIGNED BY: JUDGE GARY R. WITT DATE: 05/25/11 COPY MAILED TO PLAINTIFF'S ATTONREY 05/25/11 Calendar Notes: NOTICE OF ORDER TO APPEAR AND SHOW CAUSE WHY THIS MATTER SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED RE: LOCAL RULE 3.17.1(C) TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S ATTORNEY OF RECORD, IF ANY: YOU AND EACH OF YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR BEFORE THE COURT ON Sep 01, 2011 AT 1:30 PM IN DEPARTMENT AL OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT, then and there to show cause, if any you have, why this matter should not be dismissed. All appearances are mandatory, unless five (5) court days prior to hearing date the court has received an answer or other responsive pleading, an amended complaint converting the action to an ordinary civil action, a request for entry of default, a request for dismissal, a stipulated judgment or stipulation for entry of judgment or a notice of settlement, then no appearance is necessary. WARNING! IF YOU FAIL TO APPEAR AS ORDERED HEREIN, THIS ACTION WILL BE DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE (C.C.P. 575.2). Date: ________________________ ____________________________________ GARY R WITT Judge of the Superior Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2011
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2011
  • DocketComplaint - Unlawful Detainer - Comment:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2011
  • DocketPrejudgment Claim of Right to Possession - Comment:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2011
  • Docket841J Pmt: Unlawful Detainer Fee <$10,000 GC 70613(B); - Comment: Amount of $240.00 for A. WHITE, INC (PL-1). Received from SANDRA KUHN MCCORMACK, check no(s) 5942. Receipt #592778 for amount of $240.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2011
  • DocketCONV - Comment: New case created by deputy: 687

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where A. WHITE, INC. is a litigant