This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 07/19/2020 at 03:29:07 (UTC).

A. WHITE, INC. VS HERNANDEZ, ET AL

Case Summary

On 12/17/2019 A WHITE, INC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against HERNANDEZ. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Arvin / Lamont Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Loo, Cynthia L. and Turner, Jerold L.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0247

  • Filing Date:

    12/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Courthouse:

    Arvin / Lamont Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Loo, Cynthia L.

Turner, Jerold L.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

A. WHITE, INC.

Defendants

HERNANDEZ, GABRIELA

PEREZ, DAVID

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MCCORMACK, SANDRA KUHN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/19/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Local Rule 3.15.1(c) - Judicial Officer: Turner, Jerold L.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered; Comment: RE: DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • DocketWrit of Possession Returned Wholly Satisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judgment Type: Judgment - Clerk Default Judgment Before Trial (CL/CV); Unlawful Detainer: Awarded To: A. WHITE, INC.; Entitled to Possession of Premises at: 10401 SAN DIEGO STREET, UNIT #A8 LAMONT, CA 93241 KERN; Judgment Applies to All Occupants; The Lease Is Forfeited; Awarded Against: HERNANDEZ, GABRIELA; PEREZ, DAVID; Party: Names: A. WHITE, INC.; HERNANDEZ, GABRIELA; PEREZ, DAVID

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Partial) - Comment: WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO DOES 1 TO 10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • DocketApplication for Issuance of Writ of Possession; Affidavit - Comment: of Daily Rental Value Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • DocketWrit of Possession Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • DocketJudgment (Clerk's Default/Restitution Only) Filed & Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default and Clerks Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: PERSONAL SERVICE S TO DAVID PEREZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: SUBSTITUTED SERVICE AS TO ANY PERSON CLAIMING ANY RIGHT TO POSSESSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: PERSONAL SERVICE AS TO GABRIELA HERNANDEZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: A. WHITE, INC.; Served: 12/18/2019; Served: 12/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: Local Rule 3.15.1(c)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • DocketNotice of Commencement of Unlawful Detainer Action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • DocketAddress and Zip Code of Unlawfully Detained Property - Comment: 10401 SAN DIEGO STREET UNIT #A8 LAMONT, CA 93241 KERN COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • DocketComplaint - Unlawful Detainer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where A. WHITE, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MCCORMACK, SANDRA KUHN