This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/28/2020 at 22:04:18 (UTC).

A-L FINANCIAL VS CROWE

Case Summary

On 07/18/2013 A-L FINANCIAL filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against CROWE. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Kern County Metropolitan Division located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Etienne, Linda S. and Clark, Thomas S.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********7305

  • Filing Date:

    07/18/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Etienne, Linda S.

Clark, Thomas S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

A-L FINANCIAL CORP.

Defendant

CROWE, JESSE F.

 

Court Documents

Debtor's Examination

Debtor's Examination 12/18/2017: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: AS TO JESSE F CROWE; Parties Present Plaintiff: A-L FINANCIAL CORP.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/15/2020
  • DocketDebtor's Examination - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Comment: AS TO JESSE F CROWE **Hearing continued from 4/9/20 pursuant to Standing Order**

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • DocketApplication and Order for Appearance and Examination - Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Comment: Hearing Date: 04/9/2020 Hearing Time: 830A Department/Division:12

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2018
  • DocketAttachment for Defaulters / Bench Warrant Returned - Comment: WARRANT EXPIRED 3/19/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDebtor's Examination - Debtor's Examination 12/18/2017: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: AS TO JESSE F CROWE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2017
  • DocketProof of Service (SC-104) - Comment: AS TO JESSE F. CROWE BY PERSONAL SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2017
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Served: 12/04/20178:29 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2017
  • DocketOrder to Produce Statement of Assets and to Appear for - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Comment: Examination (Small Claims) AS TO JESSE F CROWE Hearing Date: 12/18/2017 Hearing Time: 8:30AM Department/Division:12 RETURNED VIA S.A.S.E.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/30/2015
  • DocketImage of Archived Documents

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/23/2013
  • DocketMail Returned Undelivered - Comment: Document Image

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2013
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment Mailed to All Parties - Comment: MAILED 10/11/13

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2013
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear (Small Claims) - Comment: AS TO BRENDA MARROQUIN FOR A-L FINANCIAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2013
  • DocketOrginal Documented Cancelled - Comment: CONTRACT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2013
  • DocketNP1500 - Comment: Department: 12 Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: TRIAL BY COURT. DISPOSED AFTER COURT TRIAL, BEFORE EVIDENCE BY BOTH SIDES (STATISTICAL PURPOSES ONLY). THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: BRENDA MARROQUIN APPEARS AS REPRESENTATIVE FOR A-L FINANCIAL. NO APPEARANCE BY DEFENDANT *************************************************************************************** BRENDA MARROQUIN DULY SWORN AND TESTIFIES ON BEHALF OF THE PLAINTIFF. EVIDENCE PRESENTED BY PLAINTIFF. THE COURT MAKES THE FOLLOWING FINDINGS AND ORDERS: JUDGMENT FOR PLAINTIFF AGAINST DEFENDANT FOR PRINCIPAL $2500.00 PLUS COURT COSTS OF $85.00 AND CANCELLATION OF CONTRACT.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2013
  • Docket4150 Small Claims Trial - Comment: Hearing Entered.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2013
  • DocketSmall Claims Trial - Original Type: Small Claims Trial; Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 09:30 AM; Result: CONV; Comment:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2013
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: AS TO JESSE F. CROWE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/07/2013
  • Docket854D Pmt: Small Claims Filing Fee > 12 Claims in 12 Months - Comment: Amount of $100.00 for A-L FINANCIAL CORP. (PL-1). Received from A-L FINANCIAL CORP, check no(s) 852985. Receipt #732055 for amount of $100.00.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2013
  • DocketCONV - Comment: New case created by deputy: 819

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2013
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear (Small Claims) - Comment: AS TO R. HADDIX FOR A-L FINANCIAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2013
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Defendant - Comment: RETURNED VIA SASE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where A-L FINANCIAL CORP is a litigant