This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/02/2020 at 21:11:06 (UTC).

A-L FINANCIAL VS CASTILLO ET AL

Case Summary

On 09/29/2017 A-L FINANCIAL filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against CASTILLO. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Etienne, Linda S. and Robertson, Murray J.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2985

  • Filing Date:

    09/29/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Etienne, Linda S.

Robertson, Murray J.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

A-L FINANCIAL

Defendants

PENA, BRENDA

CASTILLO, JOSE I.

 

Court Documents

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice:

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: RETURNED VIA S.A.S.E. FORM EJ-130

Small Claims Trial

Small Claims Trial 12/21/2017: Judicial Officer: Robertson, Murray J.; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Result: Held; Parties Present Plaintiff: A-L FINANCIAL

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • DocketWrit Returned Unsatisfied - Comment: County of Kern

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • DocketWrit of Execution Issued - Comment: KERN COUNTY RETURN VIA MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • DocketMemorandum of Costs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2018
  • DocketWrit of Execution Issued - Comment: KERN/MONEY - RETURNED VIA SASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2018
  • DocketMemorandum of Costs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: RETURNED VIA S.A.S.E. FORM EJ-130

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2018
  • DocketMemo of Costs / Accrued Interest

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2017
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment Mailed to All Parties - Comment: (Small Claims)SC-133 SENT TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2017
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Robertson, Murray J.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Entry of Judgment Uncontested (CS); Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: A-L FINANCIAL; Awarded Against: CASTILLO, JOSE I.; Amount; Damages: $2,500.00; Costs: $160.00; Total: $2660.00; Status: Judgment; Status Date: 12/21/2017; Status Comment: CANCELLATION OF THE ORIGINAL CONTRACT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2017
  • DocketContract - Comment: CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2017
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear (Small Claims) - Comment: AS TO A-L FINANCIAL BY ANAIS FLORES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSmall Claims Trial - Small Claims Trial 12/21/2017: Judicial Officer: Robertson, Murray J.; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2017
  • DocketProof of Service (SC-104) - Comment: AS TO JOSE I. CASTILLO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: A-L FINANCIAL; Served: 10/19/20176:30 PM; Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear (Small Claims) - Comment: BY A-L FINANCIAL AS TO R. HADDIX

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Defendant - Comment: RETURNED VIA SASE

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.