This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/02/2020 at 22:35:23 (UTC).

A-L FINANCIAL CORPORATION VS RAMOS

Case Summary

On 10/10/2017 A-L FINANCIAL CORPORATION filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against RAMOS. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Arvin / Lamont Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Staley, H.A. "Skip", Pulskamp, Gregory, Phillips, Craig G. and Staley, H. A. "Skip". The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0141

  • Filing Date:

    10/10/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Arvin / Lamont Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Staley, H.A. "Skip"

Pulskamp, Gregory

Phillips, Craig G.

Staley, H. A. "Skip"

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

A-L FINANCIAL CORPORATION

Defendant

RAMOS, CYNTHIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GARDNER, LINCOLN D

 

Court Documents

Debtor's Examination

Debtor's Examination 01/10/2019: Judicial Officer: Staley, H. A. "Skip"; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Dropped

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDebtor's Examination - Debtor's Examination 01/10/2019: Judicial Officer: Staley, H. A. "Skip"; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Dropped

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2018
  • DocketApplication and Order for Appearance and Examination - Judicial Officer: Phillips, Craig G.; Comment: Application and Order for Appearance and Examination

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2018
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judgment Type: Judgment - Default by Court Before Trial (CL/CV); Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: A-L FINANCIAL CORPORATION; Awarded Against: RAMOS, CYNTHIA; Amount; Damages: $9,663.14; Pre-Judgment Interest Rate: 10.00 %; Pre-Judgment Interest: $1,452.00; Attorney Fees: $1,699.47; Costs: $375.90; Total: $13190.51; Party: Names: A-L FINANCIAL CORPORATION; RAMOS, CYNTHIA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2018
  • DocketJudgment by Default by Clerk - Comment: Total $13,190.51 as to Cynthia Ramos

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - Judicial Officer: Pulskamp, Gregory; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered; Comment: Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2018
  • DocketDeclaration for Default - Comment: Declaration in Support of Default Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2018
  • DocketDeclaration for Default - Comment: Declaration in Support of Entry of Default Judgment and Costs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2018
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Partial) - Comment: Request for Dismissal of Does

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2018
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default by Clerk Entered - Comment: Request for Entry of Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) - Judicial Officer: Staley, H. A. "Skip"; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed; Comment: Re: Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2017
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: Substituted Service as to Cynthia Ramos

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: A-L FINANCIAL CORPORATION; Served: 10/31/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: Declaration of Lincoln D. Gardner Re Compliance with Civil Code 2984.4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010) - Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketElectronic Document(s) - Comment: Complaint for Breach of Contract (Rule 3.740 Collections)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less