This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/02/2020 at 07:19:42 (UTC).

A-L FINANCIAL CORP. VS WEST

Case Summary

On 01/03/2020 A-L FINANCIAL CORP filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against WEST. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1008

  • Filing Date:

    01/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

A-L FINANCIAL CORP.

Defendant

WEST, AARON L.

 

Court Documents

Small Claims Trial

Small Claims Trial 03/05/2020: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: $2,500.00

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/10/2020
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment Mailed to All Parties - Comment: (Small Claims)sc133 mailed to defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Entry of Judgment Uncontested (CS); Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: A-L FINANCIAL CORP.; Awarded Against: WEST, AARON L.; Amount; Damages: $2,500.00; Costs: $135.00; Total: $2635.00; Status: Judgment; Status Date: 03/05/2020; Status Comment: CANCELLATION OF THE ORIGINAL CONTRACT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • DocketContract - Comment: CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear (Small Claims)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSmall Claims Trial - Small Claims Trial 03/05/2020: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: $2,500.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • DocketProof of Service (SC-104) - Comment: As to Aaron L. West

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: A-L FINANCIAL CORP.; Served: 01/20/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear (Small Claims)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.