Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/01/2020 at 12:09:22 (UTC).

A-L FINANCIAL CORP VS RUIZ LUNA

Case Summary

On 10/20/2016 A-L FINANCIAL CORP filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against RUIZ LUNA. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********3102

  • Filing Date:

    10/20/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

A-L FINANCIAL CORP

Defendant

RUIZ LUNA, ANGIE D

 

Court Documents

Claim of Exemption

Claim of Exemption 06/11/2018: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: as to Angie D. Ruiz-Luna

Claim of Exemption

Claim of Exemption 10/16/2017: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: AS TO ANGIE D. RUIZ LUNA

Small Claims Trial

01/23/17 MO; SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Result: Judgment; Parties Present Plaintiff: A-L FINANCIAL CORP

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/01/2019
  • DocketWrit Returned Unsatisfied - Comment: County of Kern

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClaim of Exemption - Claim of Exemption 06/11/2018: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: as to Angie D. Ruiz-Luna

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2018
  • DocketOriginal Claim of Exemption, Notice of Opposition and Notice - Comment: of Hearing from Levying Officer County of Kern Currently withholding $0.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2018
  • DocketNotice of Opposition/Notice of Hearing on Claim of Exemption - Comment: as to Angie D. Ruiz-Luna

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2018
  • DocketWrit of Execution Issued - Comment: KERN/MONEY - RETURNED VIA SASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2018
  • DocketMemorandum of Costs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • DocketNotice - Comment: OF ACTION NOT TAKEN BY THE SHERIFF'S ON CLAIM OF EXEMPTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClaim of Exemption - Claim of Exemption 10/16/2017: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: AS TO ANGIE D. RUIZ LUNA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2017
  • DocketNotice of Opposition/Notice of Hearing on Claim of Exemption - Comment: AS TO ANGIE D. RUIZ LUNA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2017
  • DocketWrit of Execution Issued - Comment: COUNTY OF KERN RETURNED VIA ENCLOSED ENVELOPE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2017
  • DocketMemorandum of Credits, Interest and Costs Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2017
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment Mailed to All Parties - Comment: (Small Claims) SC-133 SENT TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2017
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Entry of Judgment Uncontested (CS); Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: A-L FINANCIAL CORP; Judgment Amount: $2,500.00; Awarded Against: RUIZ LUNA, ANGIE D; Status: Judgment; Status Date: 01/23/2017; Status Comment: COURT COSTS TO BE DETERMINED BY THE CLERK AND CANCELLATION OF THE ORIGINAL CONTRACT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2017
  • DocketContract - Comment: CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2017
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear (Small Claims) - Comment: AS TO A-L FINANCIAL BY VERONICA GARZA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSmall Claims Trial - 01/23/17 MO; SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Result: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2016
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: AS TO ANGIE D RUIZ-LUNA BY SUBSTITUTED SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2016
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: A-L FINANCIAL CORP; Served: 12/17/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2016
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Defendant - Comment: RETURNED VIA SASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2016
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear (Small Claims) - Comment: AS TO JEANNETTE CONCHA FOR A-L FINANCIAL CORP

    Read MoreRead Less