Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/17/2018 at 19:16:14 (UTC).

A-L FINANCIAL CORP. VS KLINE

Case Summary

On 07/09/2015 A-L FINANCIAL CORP filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against KLINE. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1333

  • Filing Date:

    07/09/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

A-L FINANCIAL CORP.

Defendant

KLINE, STEVEN D

 

Court Documents

Small Claims Trial

9/9/15 Minute Order - Small Claims Trial: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Result: Judgment; Parties Present Plaintiff: A-L FINANCIAL CORP.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/09/2015
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Entry of Judgment Uncontested (CS); Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: A-L FINANCIAL CORP.; Awarded Against: KLINE, STEVEN D; Amount; Damages: $1,114.75; Costs: $81.00; Total: $1195.75; Comment: Plus cancellation of original contract.; Party: Names: A-L FINANCIAL CORP.; KLINE, STEVEN D

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2015
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment Mailed to All Parties - Comment: (Small Claims)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2015
  • Original Promissory Note Cancelled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2015
  • Authorization to Appear (Small Claims) - Comment: Victor Pena

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Small Claims Trial - 9/9/15 Minute Order - Small Claims Trial: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Result: Judgment; Parties Present Plaintiff: A-L FINANCIAL CORP.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2015
  • Proof of Service - Comment: As to Steven D. Kline/Sub Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2015
  • Civil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: A-L FINANCIAL CORP.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2015
  • Authorization to Appear (Small Claims) - Comment: R HADDIX FOR A-L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2015
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Defendant - Comment: VIA SASE

    Read MoreRead Less