This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/22/2018 at 06:47:45 (UTC).

A-L FINANCIAL CORP VS HARO ET AL

Case Summary

On 10/20/2016 A-L FINANCIAL CORP filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against HARO. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3101

  • Filing Date:

    10/20/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

A-L FINANCIAL CORP

Defendants

CHUCA ALVARADO, EPIFANIO

HARO, ALEJANDRA C

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/23/2017
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Lack of Prosecution Before Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2017
  • Mail Returned Undelivered - Comment: AS TO ORDER DISMISSING ACTION - SENT TO FWD ADDRESS PROVIDED BY USPS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2017
  • Mail Returned Undelivered - Comment: AS TO ORDER DISMISSING ACTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2017
  • Order Dismissing Action (Full) - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2017
  • Small Claims Trial - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Cancel Reason: No Proof Of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2016
  • Declaration of Non-Service - Comment: AS TO EPIFANIO CHUCA-ALVARADO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2016
  • Declaration of Non-Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2016
  • Civil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: A-L FINANCIAL CORP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2016
  • Authorization to Appear (Small Claims) - Comment: AS TO A-L FINANCIAL CORP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2016
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Defendant - Comment: RETURNED VIA SASE

    Read MoreRead Less