This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/01/2020 at 23:46:24 (UTC).

A-L FINANCIAL CORP. VS GRIMES

Case Summary

On 03/30/2017 A-L FINANCIAL CORP filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against GRIMES. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1683

  • Filing Date:

    03/30/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

A-L FINANCIAL CORP.

Defendant

GRIMES, MARCUS M

 

Court Documents

Small Claims Trial

Small Claims Trial 06/16/2017: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Judgment; Parties Present Plaintiff: A-L FINANCIAL CORP.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/16/2018
  • DocketAcknowledgment of Full Satisfaction

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2018
  • DocketImage of Archived Documents

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2018
  • DocketConfidential Document - Comment: CANCELLED CONTRACT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2017
  • DocketWrit of Execution Issued - Comment: COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES. RETURNED VIA US MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2017
  • DocketMemorandum of Costs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2017
  • DocketMail Returned Undelivered - Comment: NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDMENT AS TO MARCUS M GRIMES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2017
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Entry of Judgment Uncontested (CS); Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: A-L FINANCIAL CORP.; Awarded Against: GRIMES, MARCUS M; Amount; Damages: $882.90; Costs: $135.00; Total: $1017.90; Comment: CANCELLATION OF THE ORIGINAL CONTRACT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2017
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment Mailed to All Parties - Comment: (Small Claims) SC-133 SENT TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2017
  • DocketContract - Comment: CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2017
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear (Small Claims) - Comment: AS TO CHRISTINA PENA FOR A-L FINANCIAL CORP.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSmall Claims Trial - Small Claims Trial 06/16/2017: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2017
  • DocketProof of Service (SC-104) - Comment: AS TO MARCUS M. GRIMES BY SUBSTITUTED SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: A-L FINANCIAL CORP.; Served: 04/24/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear (Small Claims) - Comment: R. HADDIX FOR A-L FINANCIAL CORP.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Defendant - Comment: RETURNED VIA SASE

    Read MoreRead Less