This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/27/2023 at 15:41:54 (UTC).

7250 DIGIORGIO ROAD LP VS RAMIREZ & ROMAN

Case Summary

On 09/17/2010 7250 DIGIORGIO ROAD LP filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against RAMIREZ ROMAN. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Kern County Arvin / Lamont Branch located in Kern, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6350

  • Filing Date:

    09/17/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

7250 DIGIORGIO ROAD LP

Defendants

RAMIREZ, MANUEL

ROMAN, SHEILA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PEAKE ALAN J

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

11/18/2010

DocketFile Type: Writ of Possession Returned Wholly Satisfied; Comment: COUNTY: KERNISSUED: 09/30/10BY: C.GARCIA; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - 7250 DIGIORGIO ROAD LP

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/29/2010

DocketFile Type: Judgment by Default by Court; Comment: TOTAL: $1977.20/AS TO: MANUEL RAMIREZ & SHEILA ROMAN/SIGNED BY: JUDGE CHARLES BREHMER/DATE: 10/29/10

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/29/2010

DocketFile Type: 134A Pmt: Photocopy GC 70627(A) EFF 1/1/06; Comment: Amount of $1.00 for 7250 DIGIORGIO ROAD LP (PL-1). Received from WALL, WALL & PEAKE, check no(s) 2922. Receipt #555969 for amount of $1.00.Detail: COPIES OF JUDGMENT.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/29/2010

DocketFile Type: 180C Pmt: Certified Copy of Paper, Record or Proceeding on; Comment: Amount of $25.00 for 7250 DIGIORGIO ROAD LP (PL-1). Received from WALL, WALL & PEAKE, check no(s) 2922. Receipt #555968 for amount of $25.00.Detail: CERTIFIED COPY OF JUDGMENT.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/29/2010

DocketFile Type: Declaration; Comment: FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT (UNALAWFUL DEATAINER); Filed By: PLAINTIFF - 7250 DIGIORGIO ROAD LP

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/29/2010

DocketFile Type: Request for Entry of Default by Court Entered; Comment: AS TO: MANUEL RAMIREZ, SHEILA ROMAN TOTAL: $1,977.20; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - 7250 DIGIORGIO ROAD LP

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/29/2010

DocketFile Type: Request for Dismissal (Partial); Comment: WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO: DOES ONLY; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - 7250 DIGIORGIO ROAD LP

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/30/2010

DocketFile Type: Hearing Vacated; Comment: Vacating calendar hearing. [calid=1371826] EventCode:4170, CourtDate:01/06/2011, Courtroom:AL, SessionNumber:2, Sequence:1, SessionType:OSC, Judge:GRW, Deputy:amandaa, SystemDate:9/21/2010 10:27:45 AM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/30/2010

DocketFile Type: 115B Pmt: Writs Issued 70626(A)(1) EFF 7/28/09; Comment: Amount of $25.00 for 7250 DIGIORGIO ROAD LP (PL-1). Received from WALL, WALL & PEAK, check no(s) 2852. Receipt #550662 for amount of $25.00.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/30/2010

DocketFile Type: Writ of Possession Issued; Comment: COUNTY: KERN ISSUED: 9/30/2010; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - 7250 DIGIORGIO ROAD LP

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
09/30/2010

DocketFile Type: Judgment; Comment: INTERLOCUTORY JUDGMENT UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - 7250 DIGIORGIO ROAD LP

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/30/2010

DocketFile Type: Request for Entry of Default by Clerk Entered; Comment: POSSESSION ONLY AS TO: MANUEL RAMIREZ, SHEILA ROMAN; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - 7250 DIGIORGIO ROAD LP

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/30/2010

DocketFile Type: Proof of Service of Summons; Comment: WHAT SERVED: SUMMONS, COMPLAINTWHO SERVED: MANUEL RAMIREZ HOW SERVED: PERSONAL SERVICE DATE SERVED: 9/23/2010; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - 7250 DIGIORGIO ROAD LP

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/30/2010

DocketFile Type: Proof of Service of Summons; Comment: WHAT SERVED: SUMMONS, COMPLAINT WHO SERVED: SHEILA ROMAN HOW SERVED: PERSONAL SERVICE DATE SERVED: 9/23/2010; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - 7250 DIGIORGIO ROAD LP

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/21/2010

DocketFile Type: Order to Show Cause; Comment: NOTICE OF ORDER TO APPEAR AND SHOW CAUSE WHY THIS MATTER SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED RE: LOCAL RULE 3.17.1(C)TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S ATTORNEY OF RECORD, IF ANY:YOU AND EACH OF YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR BEFORE THE COURT ON 1/6/2011 AT 1:30PM IN DEPARTMENT AL OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT, then and there to show cause, if any you have, why this matter should not be dismissed. All appearances are mandatory, unless five (5) court days prior to hearing date the court has received an answer or other responsive pleading, an amended complaint converting the action to an ordinary civil action, a request for entry of default, a request for dismissal, a stipulated judgment or stipulation for entry of judgment or a notice of settlement, then no appearance is necessary. WARNING! IF YOU FAIL TO APPEAR AS ORDERED HEREIN, THIS ACTION WILL BE DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE (C.C.P. 575.2).Date: ________________________ ____________________________________ [~PERSON:CALJUDGENAME] Judge of the Superior CourtCalendar Notes: NOTICE OF ORDER TO APPEAR AND SHOW CAUSE WHY THIS MATTER SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED RE: LOCAL RULE 3.17.1(C)TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S ATTORNEY OF RECORD, IF ANY:YOU AND EACH OF YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR BEFORE THE COURT ON 1/6/2011 AT 1:30PM IN DEPARTMENT AL OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT, then and there to show cause, if any you have, why this matter should not be dismissed. All appearances are mandatory, unless five (5) court days prior to hearing date the court has received an answer or other responsive pleading, an amended complaint converting the action to an ordinary civil action, a request for entry of default, a request for dismissal, a stipulated judgment or stipulation for entry of judgment or a notice of settlement, then no appearance is necessary. WARNING! IF YOU FAIL TO APPEAR AS ORDERED HEREIN, THIS ACTION WILL BE DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE (C.C.P. 575.2).Date: ________________________ ____________________________________ GARY R WITT Judge of the Superior Court

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/21/2010

DocketFile Type: Notice of Commencement of Unlawful Detainer Action; Comment: NOTICE OF COMMENCEMENT OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER ACTION An Unlawful Detainer Complaint (eviction action) has been filed naming you as a defendant.ACCESS TO THE COURT FILE WILL BE DELAYED FOR 60 DAYS EXCEPT TO A PARTY, AN ATTORNEY FOR ONE OF THE PARTIES, OR ANY PERSON WHO;(1) PROVIDES TO THE CLERK THE NAMES OF AT LEAST ONE PLAINTIFF AND ONE DEFENDANT IN THE ACTION AND PROVIDES TO THE CLERK THE ADDRESS, INCLUDING ANY APPLICABLE APARTMENT, UNIT OR SPACE NUMBER, OF THE SUBJECT PREMISES OR,(2) PROVIDES TO THE CLERK THE NAME OF ONE OF THE PARTIES IN THE ACTION OR THE CASE NUMBER AND CAN ESTABLISH THROUGH PROPER IDENTIFICATION THAT HE OR SHE LIVES IN THE SUBJECT PREMISES.ACCESS TO THE COURT INDEX, REGISTER OF ACTIONS, OR OTHER RECORDS IS NOT PERMITTED UNTIL 60 DAYS AFTER THE COMPLAINT IS FILED EXCEPT PURSUANT TO AN EXPARTE ORDER UPON SHOWING OF GOOD CAUSE THEREFORE... (SECTION 1161.2 CCP)THE ABOVE RESTRICTIONS DO NOT, HOWEVER, AFFECT OR ALTER YOUR RIGHTS OR RESPONSIBILITIES TO RESPOND TO THIS ACTION WITHIN THE TIMES PRESCRIBED BY LAW. ______________________________________________________________FOR ADDITIONAL INFORMATION YOU MAY CONTACT THE GREATER BAKERSFIELD LEGAL ASSISTANCE, INC. AT (661) 325-5943 LOCATED AT 615 CALIFORNIA AVENUE, BAKERSFIELD, CA 93304. FOR SELF HELP INFORMATION YOU MAY CONTACT THE KERN COUNTY LAW LIBRARY AND SELF HELP CENTER AT (661) 868-2532 LOCATED AT 1415 TRUXTUN AVENUE, 3RD FLOOR, BAKERSFIELD, CA 93301. OUTSIDE OF BAKERSFIELD YOU MAY CONTACT THE CALIFORNIA RURAL LEGAL ASSISTANCE AT (661) 725-4350 LOCATED AT 629 MAIN STREET, DELANO, CA 93215. Calendar Notes: NOTICE OF COMMENCEMENT OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER ACTION An Unlawful Detainer Complaint (eviction action) has been filed naming you as a defendant.ACCESS TO THE COURT FILE WILL BE DELAYED FOR 60 DAYS EXCEPT TO A PARTY, AN ATTORNEY FOR ONE OF THE PARTIES, OR ANY PERSON WHO;(1) PROVIDES TO THE CLERK THE NAMES OF AT LEAST ONE PLAINTIFF AND ONE DEFENDANT IN THE ACTION AND PROVIDES TO THE CLERK THE ADDRESS, INCLUDING ANY APPLICABLE APARTMENT, UNIT OR SPACE NUMBER, OF THE SUBJECT PREMISES OR,(2) PROVIDES TO THE CLERK THE NAME OF ONE OF THE PARTIES IN THE ACTION OR THE CASE NUMBER AND CAN ESTABLISH THROUGH PROPER IDENTIFICATION THAT HE OR SHE LIVES IN THE SUBJECT PREMISES.ACCESS TO THE COURT INDEX, REGISTER OF ACTIONS, OR OTHER RECORDS IS NOT PERMITTED UNTIL 60 DAYS AFTER THE COMPLAINT IS FILED EXCEPT PURSUANT TO AN EXPARTE ORDER UPON SHOWING OF GOOD CAUSE THEREFORE... (SECTION 1161.2 CCP)THE ABOVE RESTRICTIONS DO NOT, HOWEVER, AFFECT OR ALTER YOUR RIGHTS OR RESPONSIBILITIES TO RESPOND TO THIS ACTION WITHIN THE TIMES PRESCRIBED BY LAW. ______________________________________________________________FOR ADDITIONAL INFORMATION YOU MAY CONTACT THE GREATER BAKERSFIELD LEGAL ASSISTANCE, INC. AT (661) 325-5943 LOCATED AT 615 CALIFORNIA AVENUE, BAKERSFIELD, CA 93304. FOR SELF HELP INFORMATION YOU MAY CONTACT THE KERN COUNTY LAW LIBRARY AND SELF HELP CENTER AT (661) 868-2532 LOCATED AT 1415 TRUXTUN AVENUE, 3RD FLOOR, BAKERSFIELD, CA 93301. OUTSIDE OF BAKERSFIELD YOU MAY CONTACT THE CALIFORNIA RURAL LEGAL ASSISTANCE AT (661) 725-4350 LOCATED AT 629 MAIN STREET, DELANO, CA 93215.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/21/2010

DocketFile Type: 841H Pmt: Unlawful Detainer Fee < $10,000 GC 70613(B);; Comment: Amount of $220.00 for 7250 DIGIORGIO ROAD LP (PL-1). Received from WALL, WALL & PEAKE, check no(s) 2796. Receipt #548700 for amount of $220.00.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/21/2010

DocketFile Type: CONV; Comment: New case created by deputy: 431

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/17/2010

DocketFile Type: Summons Issued and Filed; Comment: UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - 7250 DIGIORGIO ROAD LP

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/17/2010

DocketFile Type: Complaint - Unlawful Detainer; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - 7250 DIGIORGIO ROAD LP

[+] Read More [-] Read Less