This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/11/2020 at 19:18:26 (UTC).

5905 NILES STREET V ZAK INSURANCE

Case Summary

On 04/01/2011 5905 NILES STREET filed a Property - Commercial Eviction lawsuit against ZAK INSURANCE. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Schuett, Stephen D.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********8127

  • Filing Date:

    04/01/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Commercial Eviction

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Schuett, Stephen D.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

5905 NILES STREET LLC

Defendant

ZAK INSURANCE SERVICES INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PRICE, GAIL B

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/06/2012
  • DocketAbstract Issued - Comment: RETURNED VIA MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2012
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Comment: TO: Gail B. Price, SBN 2600 Mission Street Suite 206 San Marino, Ca. 91108 RE: 5905 NILES STREET V ZAK INSURA Case No. S-1500-CL-258127, SDS NOTICE OF REJECTION / REQUEST FOR CORRECTIONS X The attached ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT papers are being returned for the following reason(s):THE JUDGMENT DATE DOES NOT MATCH THE DATE ON ITEM 8. ITEM 12 IS INCOMPLETE. __ Your pleadings have been filed; however, this matter will not be calendared for the following reason(s): __ Fee of $___________ required for _____________________. Additional fee of $___________ required. __ Filing fee of $_________________ returned. Check No. ____________________. __ Civil Case Cover Sheet required. __ Signature missing: __ Not an original. Copies not acceptable. __ Acknowledgement of Receipt must be attached to a completed Proof of Service. __ Superior Court case number / Judge's initials: __wrong __missing. __ Does not conform to Rule 2.100 - 2.119 / 3.250 / California Rules of Court. __ Attach proof of Service on opposing party. __ Correct Proof of Service as follows:_____________________________________________________. __ Default cannot be entered. Reason:_____________________________________________________. __ This pleading does not appear to be for Superior Court, Kern County. __ Summons does not conform to Complaint / Cross-Complaint. Page: 1 of 2 NOTICE OF REJECTION / REQUEST FOR CORRECTIONS (continued) RE:5905 NILES STREET V ZAK INSURA Case No. S-1500-CL-258127, SDS __ Not submitted timely under provisions of CCP Section 1005 and California Rules of Court, Rule 3.1300. __ Date you have noticed is a court holiday. __ Hearing must be renoticed for another date: Judge is unavailable from ____________________ to ____________________. Matter will be calendared at time of filing renotice with the court. NO FEE. __ Must be renoticed for ________________ a.m. in Department/Division ____________. __ Answer to complaint must accompany stipulation to set aside default. __ To dismiss entire action, need joinder of ____________________________________________________. __ Dismissal cannot be entered. Reason: ______________________________________________________. __ Need to submit dismissal without prejudice pursuant to Kern County Local Rule 336(e). __ Consolidated matter: any case numbers to which the dismissal applies must be listed in the body of the document under "other". __ Answer filed: you will be notified of trial date. __ Must file application for Writ of Possession. __ Does not conform to Kern County Local Rule __________________________________. __ Consolidated matter: all case numbers must be listed in the heading with the lead case. __ Does not conform to California Rules of Court, Rule ____________________________. __ Must use Mandatory Judicial Council form. __ Order page does not contain enough information regarding case; need at least three lines of text with identifying information for order and case (short case title and case number). __ Item(s) # _________________________________ incomplete. __ Other: _______________________________________________________________________ ______________________________________________________________________________ ______________________________________________________________________________. ANY CORRESPONDENCE REQUIRING AN ANSWER FROM THE COURT MUST BE ACCOMPANIED BY A STAMPED, SELF ADDRESSED ENVELOPE. Calendar Notes: TO: Gail B. Price, SBN 2600 Mission Street Suite 206 San Marino, Ca. 91108 RE: 5905 NILES STREET V ZAK INSURA Case No. S-1500-CL-258127, SDS NOTICE OF REJECTION / REQUEST FOR CORRECTIONS X The attached ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT papers are being returned for the following reason(s):THE JUDGMENT DATE DOES NOT MATCH THE DATE ON ITEM 8. ITEM 12 IS INCOMPLETE. __ Your pleadings have been filed; however, this matter will not be calendared for the following reason(s): __ Fee of $___________ required for _____________________. Additional fee of $___________ required. __ Filing fee of $_________________ returned. Check No. ____________________. __ Civil Case Cover Sheet required. __ Signature missing: __ Not an original. Copies not acceptable. __ Acknowledgement of Receipt must be attached to a completed Proof of Service. __ Superior Court case number / Judge's initials: __wrong __missing. __ Does not conform to Rule 2.100 - 2.119 / 3.250 / California Rules of Court. __ Attach proof of Service on opposing party. __ Correct Proof of Service as follows:_____________________________________________________. __ Default cannot be entered. Reason:_____________________________________________________. __ This pleading does not appear to be for Superior Court, Kern County. __ Summons does not conform to Complaint / Cross-Complaint. Page: 1 of 2 NOTICE OF REJECTION / REQUEST FOR CORRECTIONS (continued) RE:5905 NILES STREET V ZAK INSURA Case No. S-1500-CL-258127, SDS __ Not submitted timely under provisions of CCP Section 1005 and California Rules of Court, Rule 3.1300. __ Date you have noticed is a court holiday. __ Hearing must be renoticed for another date: Judge is unavailable from ____________________ to ____________________. Matter will be calendared at time of filing renotice with the court. NO FEE. __ Must be renoticed for ________________ a.m. in Department/Division ____________. __ Answer to complaint must accompany stipulation to set aside default. __ To dismiss entire action, need joinder of ____________________________________________________. __ Dismissal cannot be entered. Reason: ______________________________________________________. __ Need to submit dismissal without prejudice pursuant to Kern County Local Rule 336(e). __ Consolidated matter: any case numbers to which the dismissal applies must be listed in the body of the document under "other". __ Answer filed: you will be notified of trial date. __ Must file application for Writ of Possession. __ Does not conform to Kern County Local Rule __________________________________. __ Consolidated matter: all case numbers must be listed in the heading with the lead case. __ Does not conform to California Rules of Court, Rule ____________________________. __ Must use Mandatory Judicial Council form. __ Order page does not contain enough information regarding case; need at least three lines of text with identifying information for order and case (short case title and case number). __ Item(s) # _________________________________ incomplete. __ Other: _______________________________________________________________________ ______________________________________________________________________________ ______________________________________________________________________________. ANY CORRESPONDENCE REQUIRING AN ANSWER FROM THE COURT MUST BE ACCOMPANIED BY A STAMPED, SELF ADDRESSED ENVELOPE.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2012
  • Docket117B Pmt: Abstract Issued GC 70626(A)(2) EFF 7/28/09 - Comment: Amount of $15.00 for 5905 NILES STREET LLC (PL-1). Received from BRONWEN PRICE, check no(s) 3642. Receipt #654955 for amount of $15.00.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2012
  • Docket117B Pmt: Abstract Issued GC 70626(A)(2) EFF 7/28/09 - Comment: Amount of $10.00 for 5905 NILES STREET LLC (PL-1). Received from ABC LEGAL SERVICES INC., check no(s) 128643. Receipt #654954 for amount of $10.00.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2012
  • DocketFinal Judgment/Unlawful Detainer - Comment: JUDGMENT FOR:5905 NILES STREET,LLC JUDGMENT AGAINST:ZAK INSURANCE SERVIES INC, A CALIFORNIA CORORATION RENT: $21,458.30 DAMAGES: $600.00 ATTORNEY FEES: $5,114.00 LATE FEES: $910.44 PREJUDGMENT INTEREST:$1040.76 TOTAL: $29,123.50 *WOODWARD*

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/30/2012
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT CCP 585D

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/30/2012
  • DocketRequest for Court Judgment - Comment: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF COURT JUDGMENT ON DEFT:ZAK INSURANCE SERVICES,INC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION COMPLAINT FILED:4/1/2011 BY ATTY:GAIL B PRICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2012
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Comment: TO: GAIL B PRICE ESQ (ABC LEGAL SERVICE) RE: 5905 NILES STREET V ZAK INSURA Case No. S-1500-CL-258127, SDS NOTICE OF REJECTION / REQUEST FOR CORRECTIONS X_ The attached REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT PACKET_ papers are being returned for the following reason(s):ON REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT # 1(D) DEFENDANT'S NAME IS INCOMPLETE/ 2G DOES NOT CONFORM TO THE COMPLAINT DOCUMENTS RETURNED BACK VIA "ABC LEGAL" __ Your pleadings have been filed; however, this matter will not be calendared for the following reason(s): __ Fee of $___________ required for _____________________. Additional fee of $___________ required. __ Filing fee of $_________________ returned. Check No. ____________________. __ Civil Case Cover Sheet required. __ Signature missing: __ Not an original. Copies not acceptable. __ Acknowledgement of Receipt must be attached to a completed Proof of Service. __ Superior Court case number / Judge's initials: __wrong __missing. __ Does not conform to Rule 2.100 - 2.119 / 3.250 / California Rules of Court. __ Attach proof of Service on opposing party. __ Correct Proof of Service as follows:_____________________________________________________. __ Default cannot be entered. Reason:_____________________________________________________. __ This pleading does not appear to be for Superior Court, Kern County. __ Summons does not conform to Complaint / Cross-Complaint. Page: 1 of 2 NOTICE OF REJECTION / REQUEST FOR CORRECTIONS (continued) RE:5905 NILES STREET V ZAK INSURA Case No. S-1500-CL-258127, SDS __ Not submitted timely under provisions of CCP Section 1005 and California Rules of Court, Rule 3.1300. __ Date you have noticed is a court holiday. __ Hearing must be renoticed for another date: Judge is unavailable from ____________________ to ____________________. Matter will be calendared at time of filing renotice with the court. NO FEE. __ Must be renoticed for ________________ a.m. in Department/Division ____________. __ Answer to complaint must accompany stipulation to set aside default. __ To dismiss entire action, need joinder of ____________________________________________________. __ Dismissal cannot be entered. Reason: ______________________________________________________. __ Need to submit dismissal without prejudice pursuant to Kern County Local Rule 336(e). __ Consolidated matter: any case numbers to which the dismissal applies must be listed in the body of the document under "other". __ Answer filed: you will be notified of trial date. __ Must file application for Writ of Possession. __ Does not conform to Kern County Local Rule __________________________________. __ Consolidated matter: all case numbers must be listed in the heading with the lead case. __ Does not conform to California Rules of Court, Rule ____________________________. __ Must use Mandatory Judicial Council form. __ Order page does not contain enough information regarding case; need at least three lines of text with identifying information for order and case (short case title and case number). __ Item(s) # _________________________________ incomplete. __ Other: _______________________________________________________________________ ______________________________________________________________________________ ______________________________________________________________________________. ANY CORRESPONDENCE REQUIRING AN ANSWER FROM THE COURT MUST BE ACCOMPANIED BY A STAMPED, SELF ADDRESSED ENVELOPE. Calendar Notes: TO: GAIL B PRICE ESQ (ABC LEGAL SERVICE) RE: 5905 NILES STREET V ZAK INSURA Case No. S-1500-CL-258127, SDS NOTICE OF REJECTION / REQUEST FOR CORRECTIONS X_ The attached REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT PACKET_ papers are being returned for the following reason(s):ON REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT # 1(D) DEFENDANT'S NAME IS INCOMPLETE/ 2G DOES NOT CONFORM TO THE COMPLAINT DOCUMENTS RETURNED BACK VIA "ABC LEGAL" __ Your pleadings have been filed; however, this matter will not be calendared for the following reason(s): __ Fee of $___________ required for _____________________. Additional fee of $___________ required. __ Filing fee of $_________________ returned. Check No. ____________________. __ Civil Case Cover Sheet required. __ Signature missing: __ Not an original. Copies not acceptable. __ Acknowledgement of Receipt must be attached to a completed Proof of Service. __ Superior Court case number / Judge's initials: __wrong __missing. __ Does not conform to Rule 2.100 - 2.119 / 3.250 / California Rules of Court. __ Attach proof of Service on opposing party. __ Correct Proof of Service as follows:_____________________________________________________. __ Default cannot be entered. Reason:_____________________________________________________. __ This pleading does not appear to be for Superior Court, Kern County. __ Summons does not conform to Complaint / Cross-Complaint. Page: 1 of 2 NOTICE OF REJECTION / REQUEST FOR CORRECTIONS (continued) RE:5905 NILES STREET V ZAK INSURA Case No. S-1500-CL-258127, SDS __ Not submitted timely under provisions of CCP Section 1005 and California Rules of Court, Rule 3.1300. __ Date you have noticed is a court holiday. __ Hearing must be renoticed for another date: Judge is unavailable from ____________________ to ____________________. Matter will be calendared at time of filing renotice with the court. NO FEE. __ Must be renoticed for ________________ a.m. in Department/Division ____________. __ Answer to complaint must accompany stipulation to set aside default. __ To dismiss entire action, need joinder of ____________________________________________________. __ Dismissal cannot be entered. Reason: ______________________________________________________. __ Need to submit dismissal without prejudice pursuant to Kern County Local Rule 336(e). __ Consolidated matter: any case numbers to which the dismissal applies must be listed in the body of the document under "other". __ Answer filed: you will be notified of trial date. __ Must file application for Writ of Possession. __ Does not conform to Kern County Local Rule __________________________________. __ Consolidated matter: all case numbers must be listed in the heading with the lead case. __ Does not conform to California Rules of Court, Rule ____________________________. __ Must use Mandatory Judicial Council form. __ Order page does not contain enough information regarding case; need at least three lines of text with identifying information for order and case (short case title and case number). __ Item(s) # _________________________________ incomplete. __ Other: _______________________________________________________________________ ______________________________________________________________________________ ______________________________________________________________________________. ANY CORRESPONDENCE REQUIRING AN ANSWER FROM THE COURT MUST BE ACCOMPANIED BY A STAMPED, SELF ADDRESSED ENVELOPE.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/17/2011
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Comment: TO: GAIL B PRICE 2600 MISSION STREET STE 206 SAN MARINO, CA 91108 RE: 5905 NILES STREET V ZAK INSURA Case No. S-1500-CL-258127, SDS NOTICE OF REJECTION / REQUEST FOR CORRECTIONS X The attached JUDGMENT papers are being returned for the following reason(s): ON REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT 2 G DOES NOT CONFORM TO COMPLAINT. __ Your pleadings have been filed; however, this matter will not be calendared for the following reason(s): __ Fee of $___________ required for _____________________. Additional fee of $___________ required. __ Filing fee of $_________________ returned. Check No. ____________________. __ Civil Case Cover Sheet required. __ Signature missing: __ Not an original. Copies not acceptable. __ Acknowledgement of Receipt must be attached to a completed Proof of Service. __ Superior Court case number / Judge's initials: __wrong __missing. __ Does not conform to Rule 2.100 - 2.119 / 3.250 / California Rules of Court. __ Attach proof of Service on opposing party. __ Correct Proof of Service as follows:_____________________________________________________. __ Default cannot be entered. Reason:_____________________________________________________. __ This pleading does not appear to be for Superior Court, Kern County. __ Summons does not conform to Complaint / Cross-Complaint. Page: 1 of 2 NOTICE OF REJECTION / REQUEST FOR CORRECTIONS (continued) RE:5905 NILES STREET V ZAK INSURA Case No. S-1500-CL-258127, SDS __ Not submitted timely under provisions of CCP Section 1005 and California Rules of Court, Rule 3.1300. __ Date you have noticed is a court holiday. __ Hearing must be renoticed for another date: Judge is unavailable from ____________________ to ____________________. Matter will be calendared at time of filing renotice with the court. NO FEE. __ Must be renoticed for ________________ a.m. in Department/Division ____________. __ Answer to complaint must accompany stipulation to set aside default. __ To dismiss entire action, need joinder of ____________________________________________________. __ Dismissal cannot be entered. Reason: ______________________________________________________. __ Need to submit dismissal without prejudice pursuant to Kern County Local Rule 336(e). __ Consolidated matter: any case numbers to which the dismissal applies must be listed in the body of the document under "other". __ Answer filed: you will be notified of trial date. __ Must file application for Writ of Possession. __ Does not conform to Kern County Local Rule __________________________________. __ Consolidated matter: all case numbers must be listed in the heading with the lead case. __ Does not conform to California Rules of Court, Rule ____________________________. __ Must use Mandatory Judicial Council form. __ Order page does not contain enough information regarding case; need at least three lines of text with identifying information for order and case (short case title and case number). __ Item(s) # _________________________________ incomplete. __ Other: _______________________________________________________________________ ______________________________________________________________________________ ______________________________________________________________________________. ANY CORRESPONDENCE REQUIRING AN ANSWER FROM THE COURT MUST BE ACCOMPANIED BY A STAMPED, SELF ADDRESSED ENVELOPE. Calendar Notes: TO: GAIL B PRICE 2600 MISSION STREET STE 206 SAN MARINO, CA 91108 RE: 5905 NILES STREET V ZAK INSURA Case No. S-1500-CL-258127, SDS NOTICE OF REJECTION / REQUEST FOR CORRECTIONS X The attached JUDGMENT papers are being returned for the following reason(s): ON REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT 2 G DOES NOT CONFORM TO COMPLAINT. __ Your pleadings have been filed; however, this matter will not be calendared for the following reason(s): __ Fee of $___________ required for _____________________. Additional fee of $___________ required. __ Filing fee of $_________________ returned. Check No. ____________________. __ Civil Case Cover Sheet required. __ Signature missing: __ Not an original. Copies not acceptable. __ Acknowledgement of Receipt must be attached to a completed Proof of Service. __ Superior Court case number / Judge's initials: __wrong __missing. __ Does not conform to Rule 2.100 - 2.119 / 3.250 / California Rules of Court. __ Attach proof of Service on opposing party. __ Correct Proof of Service as follows:_____________________________________________________. __ Default cannot be entered. Reason:_____________________________________________________. __ This pleading does not appear to be for Superior Court, Kern County. __ Summons does not conform to Complaint / Cross-Complaint. Page: 1 of 2 NOTICE OF REJECTION / REQUEST FOR CORRECTIONS (continued) RE:5905 NILES STREET V ZAK INSURA Case No. S-1500-CL-258127, SDS __ Not submitted timely under provisions of CCP Section 1005 and California Rules of Court, Rule 3.1300. __ Date you have noticed is a court holiday. __ Hearing must be renoticed for another date: Judge is unavailable from ____________________ to ____________________. Matter will be calendared at time of filing renotice with the court. NO FEE. __ Must be renoticed for ________________ a.m. in Department/Division ____________. __ Answer to complaint must accompany stipulation to set aside default. __ To dismiss entire action, need joinder of ____________________________________________________. __ Dismissal cannot be entered. Reason: ______________________________________________________. __ Need to submit dismissal without prejudice pursuant to Kern County Local Rule 336(e). __ Consolidated matter: any case numbers to which the dismissal applies must be listed in the body of the document under "other". __ Answer filed: you will be notified of trial date. __ Must file application for Writ of Possession. __ Does not conform to Kern County Local Rule __________________________________. __ Consolidated matter: all case numbers must be listed in the heading with the lead case. __ Does not conform to California Rules of Court, Rule ____________________________. __ Must use Mandatory Judicial Council form. __ Order page does not contain enough information regarding case; need at least three lines of text with identifying information for order and case (short case title and case number). __ Item(s) # _________________________________ incomplete. __ Other: _______________________________________________________________________ ______________________________________________________________________________ ______________________________________________________________________________. ANY CORRESPONDENCE REQUIRING AN ANSWER FROM THE COURT MUST BE ACCOMPANIED BY A STAMPED, SELF ADDRESSED ENVELOPE.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2011
  • DocketWrit of Possession Returned Wholly Satisfied - Comment:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 04/28/2011
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Partial) - Comment: AS TO DOES 1-10 ONLY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2011
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Comment: LINE 1 c. ON REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEAULT DEFENDANT IS NAMED INCORRECTLY PARTIES NAMED ON DEFAULT MUST CONFORM TO COMPLAINT. ADDRESS ON WRIT MUST CONFORM TO THE ADDRESS ON COMPLAINT. ONLY PHYSICAL ADDRESS OF REAL PROPERTY INVOLVED IN UNLAWFUL DETAINER MAY BE LISTED ON WRIT OF POSSESSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2011
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: WHAT SERVED:SUMMONS;COMPALINT; PREJUDGMENT CLAIM WHO SERVED:ZAK INSURANCE SERVICES INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION HOW SERVED:SUBSTITUTED DATE SERVED:4/12/11

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2011
  • Docket841J Pmt: Unlawful Detainer Fee <$10,000 GC 70613(B); - Comment: Amount of $240.00 for 5905 NILES STREET LLC (PL-1). Received from 5905 NILES STREET LLC, check no(s) 3385. Receipt #583097 for amount of $240.00.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2011
  • DocketNotice of Commencement of Unlawful Detainer Action - Comment: NOTICE OF COMMENCEMENT OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER ACTION An Unlawful Detainer Complaint (eviction action) has been filed naming you as a defendant. ACCESS TO THE COURT FILE WILL BE DELAYED FOR 60 DAYS EXCEPT TO A PARTY, AN ATTORNEY FOR ONE OF THE PARTIES, OR ANY PERSON WHO; (1) PROVIDES TO THE CLERK THE NAMES OF AT LEAST ONE PLAINTIFF AND ONE DEFENDANT IN THE ACTION AND PROVIDES TO THE CLERK THE ADDRESS, INCLUDING ANY APPLICABLE APARTMENT, UNIT OR SPACE NUMBER, OF THE SUBJECT PREMISES OR, (2) PROVIDES TO THE CLERK THE NAME OF ONE OF THE PARTIES IN THE ACTION OR THE CASE NUMBER AND CAN ESTABLISH THROUGH PROPER IDENTIFICATION THAT HE OR SHE LIVES IN THE SUBJECT PREMISES. ACCESS TO THE COURT INDEX, REGISTER OF ACTIONS, OR OTHER RECORDS IS NOT PERMITTED UNTIL 60 DAYS AFTER THE COMPLAINT IS FILED EXCEPT PURSUANT TO AN EXPARTE ORDER UPON SHOWING OF GOOD CAUSE THEREFORE... (SECTION 1161.2 CCP) THE ABOVE RESTRICTIONS DO NOT, HOWEVER, AFFECT OR ALTER YOUR RIGHTS OR RESPONSIBILITIES TO RESPOND TO THIS ACTION WITHIN THE TIMES PRESCRIBED BY LAW. ______________________________________________________________ FOR ADDITIONAL INFORMATION YOU MAY CONTACT THE GREATER BAKERSFIELD LEGAL ASSISTANCE, INC. AT (661) 325-5943 LOCATED AT 615 CALIFORNIA AVENUE, BAKERSFIELD, CA 93304. FOR SELF HELP INFORMATION YOU MAY CONTACT THE KERN COUNTY LAW LIBRARY AND SELF HELP CENTER AT (661) 868-2532 LOCATED AT 1415 TRUXTUN AVENUE, 3RD FLOOR, BAKERSFIELD, CA 93301. OUTSIDE OF BAKERSFIELD YOU MAY CONTACT THE CALIFORNIA RURAL LEGAL ASSISTANCE AT (661) 725-4350 LOCATED AT 629 MAIN STREET, DELANO, CA 93215. Calendar Notes: NOTICE OF COMMENCEMENT OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER ACTION An Unlawful Detainer Complaint (eviction action) has been filed naming you as a defendant. ACCESS TO THE COURT FILE WILL BE DELAYED FOR 60 DAYS EXCEPT TO A PARTY, AN ATTORNEY FOR ONE OF THE PARTIES, OR ANY PERSON WHO; (1) PROVIDES TO THE CLERK THE NAMES OF AT LEAST ONE PLAINTIFF AND ONE DEFENDANT IN THE ACTION AND PROVIDES TO THE CLERK THE ADDRESS, INCLUDING ANY APPLICABLE APARTMENT, UNIT OR SPACE NUMBER, OF THE SUBJECT PREMISES OR, (2) PROVIDES TO THE CLERK THE NAME OF ONE OF THE PARTIES IN THE ACTION OR THE CASE NUMBER AND CAN ESTABLISH THROUGH PROPER IDENTIFICATION THAT HE OR SHE LIVES IN THE SUBJECT PREMISES. ACCESS TO THE COURT INDEX, REGISTER OF ACTIONS, OR OTHER RECORDS IS NOT PERMITTED UNTIL 60 DAYS AFTER THE COMPLAINT IS FILED EXCEPT PURSUANT TO AN EXPARTE ORDER UPON SHOWING OF GOOD CAUSE THEREFORE... (SECTION 1161.2 CCP) THE ABOVE RESTRICTIONS DO NOT, HOWEVER, AFFECT OR ALTER YOUR RIGHTS OR RESPONSIBILITIES TO RESPOND TO THIS ACTION WITHIN THE TIMES PRESCRIBED BY LAW. ______________________________________________________________ FOR ADDITIONAL INFORMATION YOU MAY CONTACT THE GREATER BAKERSFIELD LEGAL ASSISTANCE, INC. AT (661) 325-5943 LOCATED AT 615 CALIFORNIA AVENUE, BAKERSFIELD, CA 93304. FOR SELF HELP INFORMATION YOU MAY CONTACT THE KERN COUNTY LAW LIBRARY AND SELF HELP CENTER AT (661) 868-2532 LOCATED AT 1415 TRUXTUN AVENUE, 3RD FLOOR, BAKERSFIELD, CA 93301. OUTSIDE OF BAKERSFIELD YOU MAY CONTACT THE CALIFORNIA RURAL LEGAL ASSISTANCE AT (661) 725-4350 LOCATED AT 629 MAIN STREET, DELANO, CA 93215.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2011
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.15.1(c) - Comment: NOTICE OF ORDER TO APPEAR AND SHOW CAUSE WHY THIS MATTER SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED RE: LOCAL RULE 3.17.1(C) TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S ATTORNEY OF RECORD, IF ANY: YOU AND EACH OF YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR BEFORE THE COURT ON Jun 30, 2011 AT 1:30 PM IN DEPARTMENT 17 OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT, then and there to show cause, if any you have, why this matter should not be dismissed. All appearances are mandatory, unless five (5) court days prior to hearing date the court has received an answer or other responsive pleading, an amended complaint converting the action to an ordinary civil action, a request for entry of default, a request for dismissal, a stipulated judgment or stipulation for entry of judgment or a notice of settlement, then no appearance is necessary. WARNING! IF YOU FAIL TO APPEAR AS ORDERED HEREIN, THIS ACTION WILL BE DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE (C.C.P. 575.2). Date: ________________________ ____________________________________ STEPHEN D SCHUETT Judge of the Superior Court Calendar Notes: NOTICE OF ORDER TO APPEAR AND SHOW CAUSE WHY THIS MATTER SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED RE: LOCAL RULE 3.17.1(C) TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S ATTORNEY OF RECORD, IF ANY: YOU AND EACH OF YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR BEFORE THE COURT ON Jun 30, 2011 AT 1:30 PM IN DEPARTMENT 17 OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT, then and there to show cause, if any you have, why this matter should not be dismissed. All appearances are mandatory, unless five (5) court days prior to hearing date the court has received an answer or other responsive pleading, an amended complaint converting the action to an ordinary civil action, a request for entry of default, a request for dismissal, a stipulated judgment or stipulation for entry of judgment or a notice of settlement, then no appearance is necessary. WARNING! IF YOU FAIL TO APPEAR AS ORDERED HEREIN, THIS ACTION WILL BE DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE (C.C.P. 575.2). Date: ________________________ ____________________________________ STEPHEN D SCHUETT Judge of the Superior Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2011
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2011
  • DocketAddress and Zip Code of Unlawfully Detained Property - Comment: 6007-3 NILES STREET BAKERSFIELD CA 93306

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2011
  • DocketComplaint - Unlawful Detainer - Comment: GAIL PRICE, ESQ.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2011
  • DocketCONV - Comment: New case created by deputy: 790

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where 5905 NILES STREET LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ATTORNEYS AT LAW - GAIL B. PRICE