This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 12/03/2021 at 08:47:11 (UTC).

21ST CENTURY INSURANCE COMPANY VS SHIPP

Case Summary

On 10/04/2021 21ST CENTURY INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against SHIPP. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********5403

  • Filing Date:

    10/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

21ST CENTURY INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendant

SHIPP, JOSEPH EMANUEL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BENSON, SUSAN M

Defendant Attorney

CORDOVA, MARIA G

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause

Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 1/19/2022 Hearing Time: 8:30 am Hearing Department/Division: 12

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint - Comment: Answer to Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: as to Joseph Emanuel Shipp via personal service.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Served: 10/18/20216:40 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 1/19/2022 Hearing Time: 8:30 am Hearing Department/Division: 12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • DocketStatement of Classification and Location

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where 21st Century Assurance Company is a litigant