This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 04/25/2022 at 15:26:05 (UTC).

CONSOLIDATE WITH 20CECG03510

Case Summary

On 03/22/2021 CONSOLIDATE WITH 20CECG03510 was filed as a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Brickey, Gabriel and Gaab, Kimberly. The case status is Other - Consolidated.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0811

  • Filing Date:

    03/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other - Consolidated

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Brickey, Gabriel

Gaab, Kimberly

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Zenith Insurance Company

Defendants

Ibarra, David Michael

Kalirai Freight LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Barbagallo, W. Brad

Defendant Attorney

Kronlund, Michael C.

 

Court Documents

Civil case cover sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Hearing

CV-48 Notice of Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for All Purposes; Comment: CMC set for 7/20/21 in Dept. 402 at 3:30pm. Assignment of Judge for all purposes.

Summons issued and filed

Summons

Civil Complaint filed

Complaint

Minute Order Attachment

07/20/2021: Minute Order Attachment

Answer/Response/Denial/Demurrer - First Appearance Fee

06/30/2021: Answer/Response/Denial/Demurrer - First Appearance Fee

Notice of Deposit of Jury Fees.pdf

06/29/2021: Notice of Deposit of Jury Fees.pdf

Zenith_CMS_CMC_7.20.2021.pdf

06/29/2021: Zenith_CMS_CMC_7.20.2021.pdf

Notice of Action.pdf

06/28/2021: Notice of Action.pdf

Proof of Service

06/18/2021: Proof of Service

CV-48 Notice of Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for All Purposes

03/23/2021: CV-48 Notice of Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for All Purposes

Summons

03/23/2021: Summons

Civil Case Cover Sheet

03/22/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

03/22/2021: Complaint

Stipulation and Order filed

08/05/2021: Stipulation and Order filed

Stipulation and Order filed

Stipulation and Order filed; Judicial Officer: Gaab, Kimberly; Comment: consolidate case with 21CECG00811. 20CECG03510 shall be the lead case.

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Answer Filed

Answer/Response/Denial/Demurrer - First Appearance Fee

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketCase Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Brickey, Gabriel; Hearing Time: 3:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Off Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment; Judicial Officer: Gaab, Kimberly; Judgment Type: Order Consolidating Actions; Party; Names: Zenith Insurance Company; Ibarra, David Michael; Kalirai Freight LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStipulation and Order filed; Judicial Officer: Gaab, Kimberly; Comment: consolidate case with 21CECG00811. 20CECG03510 shall be the lead case.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinute Order Attachment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • DocketCase Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Brickey, Gabriel; Hearing Time: 3:30 PM; Result: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for Kalirai Freight LLC: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2021-40701 Kalirai Freight LLC $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for Kalirai Freight LLC: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • FinancialFinancial: Kalirai Freight LLC; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for Zenith Insurance Company: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2021-40290 Zenith Insurance Company $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Filed; Comment: Notice of Action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketSummons and Complaint; Served: 06/01/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for Zenith Insurance Company: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2021-17515 Zenith Insurance Company $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for Zenith Insurance Company: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • FinancialFinancial: Zenith Insurance Company; Total Financial Assessment $585.00; Total Payments and Credits $585.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing; Comment: CMC set for 7/20/21 in Dept. 402 at 3:30pm. Assignment of Judge for all purposes.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil case cover sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Complaint filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ZENITH INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kronlund, Michael C