This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 11/25/2021 at 15:02:52 (UTC).

Yesenia Gonzalez vs. Clovis Unified School District

Case Summary

On 10/27/2020 Yesenia Gonzalez filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Clovis Unified School District. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Tharpe, D Tyler, Culver Kapetan, Kristi and Brickey, Gabriel. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3169

  • Filing Date:

    10/27/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Tharpe, D Tyler

Culver Kapetan, Kristi

Brickey, Gabriel

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Gonzalez, Yesenia

Defendants

Clovis Unified School District

Ortega, Vicente

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Bonakdar, Roger S.

Defendant Attorney

Shapazian, Larry H.

 

Court Documents

Civil Complaint filed

Complaint

Order Granting Waiver of Court Fees and Cost Signed

Proposed Order; Comment: signed by clerk

Notice of Hearing

CV-48 Notice of Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for All Purposes; Comment: Notice of Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for All Purposes

Notice of Hearing

CV-31 Notice of Dismissal Hearing Pursuant to Rule 3.3185; CV-31 Notice of Dismissal Hearing Pursuant to Rule 3.3185; Comment: Notice of Dismissal hearing

Notice of Hearing

CV-31 Notice of Dismissal Hearing Pursuant to Rule 3.3185; CV-31 Notice of Dismissal Hearing Pursuant to Rule 3.3185; Comment: Notice of Dismissal hearing

Conditional Settlement Reached

Notice; Comment: Projected Completion Date: 11/19/21

Case Management Statement Filed

Case Management Statement; Comment: HRG 8-4-21: Case Management Statement

Answer Filed

Answer/Response/Denial/Demurrer - No Fee

Answer Filed

Answer/Response/Denial/Demurrer - No Fee; Comment: Answer to First Amended Complaint

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Case Management Statement Filed

Case Management Statement

Summons issued and filed

Summons; Comment: Summons to First Amended Complaint

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Order for Guardian Ad Litem Filed

Order for Guardian Ad Litem Filed; Judicial Officer: Culver Kapetan, Kristi

Amended Document Filed

Amended Complaint - Claim Amount Unchanged (No Fee); Comment: First Amended Complaint

Application for Guardian Ad Litem Received

Application; Comment: **order signed and fwd to clerks office on 3/1/21** Forwarded to Dept. 403

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/11/2022
  • DocketCRC 3.1385 After Settlement- Judicial Officer: Brickey, Gabriel; Hearing Time: 3:31 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketCase Management Conference- Judicial Officer: Brickey, Gabriel; Hearing Time: 3:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Settled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing- CV-31 Notice of Dismissal Hearing Pursuant to Rule 3.3185; CV-31 Notice of Dismissal Hearing Pursuant to Rule 3.3185; Comment: Notice of Dismissal hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for Ortega, Vicente: Government Exemption Claimed $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for Ortega, Vicente: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • FinancialFinancial: Ortega, Vicente; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketConditional Settlement Reached- Notice; Comment: Projected Completion Date: 11/19/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement Filed- Case Management Statement; Comment: HRG 8-4-21: Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • DocketGovernment Exemption Claimed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer Filed- Answer/Response/Denial/Demurrer - No Fee

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketCase Management Conference- Judicial Officer: Brickey, Gabriel; Hearing Time: 3:30 PM; Result: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder for Guardian Ad Litem Filed- Order for Guardian Ad Litem Filed; Judicial Officer: Culver Kapetan, Kristi

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketChambers Work- Pre- Judicial Officer: Culver Kapetan, Kristi; Hearing Time: 5:30 PM; Result: Chambers Work - Order Submitted for Consideration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAmended Document Filed- Amended Complaint - Claim Amount Unchanged (No Fee); Comment: First Amended Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketApplication for Guardian Ad Litem Received- Application; Comment: **order signed and fwd to clerks office on 3/1/21** Forwarded to Dept. 403

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement Filed- Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing- Civil Document; Comment: Notice of New Time and Date for Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing- CV-48 Notice of Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for All Purposes; Comment: Notice of Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for All Purposes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Complaint filed- Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Granting Waiver of Court Fees and Cost Signed- Proposed Order; Comment: signed by clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Clovis Unified School District is a litigant