Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 04/20/2021 at 12:04:18 (UTC).

Westlake Services, LLC vs. Gary Phillips

Case Summary

On 04/06/2021 Westlake Services, LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Gary Phillips. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Brickey, Gabriel. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2812

  • Filing Date:

    04/06/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judge

Brickey, Gabriel

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Westlake Financial Services

Westlake Services, LLC

Defendant

Phillips, Gary

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Brandt, Justin M.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Hearing

CV-16 Notice of Case Management Conference; Comment: CMC set on 8/3/2021 at 3:30p.m., Department 402

Summons issued and filed

8921926 Phillips Summons.pdf

Civil Complaint filed

8921926.pdf

Civil case cover sheet

8921926_Phillips_CCCS.pdf

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/03/2021
  • DocketCase Management Conference- Judicial Officer: Brickey, Gabriel; Hearing Time: 3:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for Westlake Services, LLC: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2021-21158 Westlake Services, LLC $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for Westlake Services, LLC: Transaction Assessment $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • FinancialFinancial: Westlake Services, LLC; Total Financial Assessment $225.00; Total Payments and Credits $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing- CV-16 Notice of Case Management Conference; Comment: CMC set on 8/3/2021 at 3:30p.m., Department 402

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed- 8921926 Phillips Summons.pdf

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Complaint filed- 8921926.pdf

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil case cover sheet- 8921926_Phillips_CCCS.pdf

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WESTLAKE FINANCIAL SERVICES is a litigant

Latest cases where WESTLAKE SERVICES LLC DBA WESTLAKE FINANCIAL SERVICES A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BRANDT, JUSTIN M.