This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 04/27/2022 at 02:56:45 (UTC).

Western General Insurance Company vs. Sylvia Ramirez

Case Summary

On 06/28/2021 Western General Insurance Company filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Sylvia Ramirez. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Brickey, Gabriel. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5027

  • Filing Date:

    06/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judge

Brickey, Gabriel

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Western General Insurance Company

Defendants

Ramirez, Sylvia

Navarro, Paula Plasencia

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Benson, Susan M.

 

Court Documents

Civil Complaint filed

44314Complain0074e70

Civil case cover sheet

44314CivilCas01bef3d

Summons issued and filed

44314SummonsS026416a

Notice of Hearing

CV-16 Notice of Case Management Conference; Comment: CMC set for 10/28/21 in Dept 402 at 3:30 PM

Request for Dismissal Received - Pending Review

46810Requestf00162d1

44314Complain0074e70

06/28/2021: 44314Complain0074e70

44314CivilCas01bef3d

06/28/2021: 44314CivilCas01bef3d

44314SummonsS026416a

06/29/2021: 44314SummonsS026416a

CV-16 Notice of Case Management Conference

06/29/2021: CV-16 Notice of Case Management Conference

46810Requestf00162d1

09/03/2021: 46810Requestf00162d1

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/28/2021
  • DocketCase Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Brickey, Gabriel; Hearing Time: 3:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Off Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment; Judgment Type: Request for Dismissal filed; Party; Names: Western General Insurance Company; Ramirez, Sylvia; Navarro, Paula Plasencia; Comment: without prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal Received - Pending Review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for Western General Insurance Company: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2021-40233 Western General Insurance Company $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for Western General Insurance Company: Transaction Assessment $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • FinancialFinancial: Western General Insurance Company; Total Financial Assessment $225.00; Total Payments and Credits $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing; Comment: CMC set for 10/28/21 in Dept 402 at 3:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil case cover sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Complaint filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WESTERN GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BENSON SUSAN M