Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 12/29/2020 at 12:18:37 (UTC).

Wesco Distribution, Inc., a Delaware corporation vs. Sandra Slumberger

Case Summary

On 10/30/2020 Wesco Distribution, Inc , a Delaware corporation filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Sandra Slumberger. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Gaab, Kimberly and Tharpe, D Tyler. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3211

  • Filing Date:

    10/30/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Gaab, Kimberly

Tharpe, D Tyler

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Wesco Distribution, Inc., a Delaware corporation

Defendants

Slumberger, Sandra S.

Cable Links Construction Group, Inc., a California corporation

Payne, Daniel G.

The Western Surety Company, a South Dakota corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Schwartz, Robert D

Defendant Attorney

Pagan, John M.

 

Court Documents

Answer Filed

Answer/Response/Denial/Demurrer - First Appearance Fee

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Signed POS 15407578.pdf

Proof of Service

Signed POS 15407580.pdf

Notice of Hearing

CV-48 Notice of Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for All Purposes; Comment: of CMC and Assignment of Judge for All Purposes

Summons issued and filed

05102679.pdf

Civil case cover sheet

05102685.pdf

Civil Complaint filed

05102676.pdf

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/09/2021
  • DocketCase Management Conference- Judicial Officer: Tharpe, D Tyler; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for Wesco Distribution, Inc., a Delaware corporation: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2020-77802 Wesco Distribution, Inc., a Delaware corporation $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for Wesco Distribution, Inc., a Delaware corporation: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer Filed- Answer/Response/Denial/Demurrer - First Appearance Fee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • DocketSummons and Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • DocketSummons and Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service- Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service- Signed POS 15407578.pdf

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • DocketSummons and Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service- Signed POS 15407580.pdf

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for Wesco Distribution, Inc., a Delaware corporation: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2020-71472 Wesco Distribution, Inc., a Delaware corporation $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for Wesco Distribution, Inc., a Delaware corporation: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • FinancialFinancial: Wesco Distribution, Inc., a Delaware corporation; Total Financial Assessment $870.00; Total Payments and Credits $870.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing- CV-48 Notice of Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for All Purposes; Comment: of CMC and Assignment of Judge for All Purposes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed- 05102679.pdf

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil case cover sheet- 05102685.pdf

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Complaint filed- 05102676.pdf

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Cable Links Construction Group, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where WESCO DISTRIBUTION INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where Western Surety Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PAGAN JOHN