This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 06/12/2022 at 16:01:49 (UTC).

Vivint Solar Developer, LLC vs. Merle Jones

Case Summary

On 03/14/2022 Vivint Solar Developer, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Merle Jones. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Negin, Stephanie, Tharpe, D Tyler and Brickey, Gabriel. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0777

  • Filing Date:

    03/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Negin, Stephanie

Tharpe, D Tyler

Brickey, Gabriel

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Vivint Solar Developer, LLC

Defendant

Jones, Merle

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Benbow, Jillian A

 

Court Documents

3/14/22 - Complaint

03/14/2022: 3/14/22 - Complaint

3/14/22 - Civil Case Cover Sheet

03/14/2022: 3/14/22 - Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/14/22 - Summons

03/15/2022: 3/14/22 - Summons

CV-48 Notice of Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for All Purposes

03/17/2022: CV-48 Notice of Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for All Purposes

3/21/22 - Declaration of Non Service

03/21/2022: 3/21/22 - Declaration of Non Service

4/18/2022-Declaration of Non Service of Summons and Complaint

04/18/2022: 4/18/2022-Declaration of Non Service of Summons and Complaint

5-17-22 Declaration of Non Service

05/17/2022: 5-17-22 Declaration of Non Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/21/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Negin, Stephanie; Hearing Time: 3:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration Filed; Comment: Declaration of Non Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service; Comment: Declaration of Non Service of Summons and Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration Filed; Comment: of Non Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing; Comment: Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for all Purposes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for Vivint Solar Developer, LLC: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2022-16473 Vivint Solar Developer, LLC $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for Vivint Solar Developer, LLC: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • FinancialFinancial: Vivint Solar Developer, LLC; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil case cover sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Complaint filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Vivint Solar Developer LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Benbow, Jillian A