This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 01/20/2022 at 18:08:37 (UTC).

Vincent G. Zaninovich, Jr. and Mary T. Zaninovich vs. Gywn Krstich

Case Summary

On 02/16/2021 Vincent G Zaninovich, Jr and Mary T Zaninovich filed an Other lawsuit against Gywn Krstich. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Culver Kapetan, Kristi and Brickey, Gabriel. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0465

  • Filing Date:

    02/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Culver Kapetan, Kristi

Brickey, Gabriel

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Vincent G. Zaninovich, Jr. and Mary T. Zaninovich

Co-Trustees of the Vincent George Zaninovich and Mary Therese Zaninovich Joint Living Trust, Dated June 11, 2010

Defendants

Barletta, Susan

Koszyk, Sarah

Barletta, Brett

Harrell, Jillian

Michael, Sheryl

as personal representative of Karen Leigh Storey, deceased

Hair, Gail

Prigmore, Matthew

Koszyk, Carol

Barletta, Paige

Trustee of Trust A under the Jeffrey J. Kristich and Gwyn L. Kristich Inter Vivios Trust, dated April 8, 2002

Krstich, Gywm L.

Krstich, Gywn L.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jaech, Jeffrey A.

Defendant Attorney

Sagaser, Howard A

 

Court Documents

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Notice Filed

11/24/21 Notice of Case Management Conf.; Comment: of Case Management Conference

Case Management Statement Filed

11/24/21 Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement Filed

11/23/21 - Case Management Statement HRG 12/9/21; Comment: Case Management Statement

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Proof of Service; Comment: ***DEFECTIVE: Name of party doesn't match or isn't listed on the complaint. Notice of Receipt and Acknowledgement of Receipt is not attached as stated in Item 5c(3). - Sheryl Storey Michael

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

41 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/15/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference- Judicial Officer: Brickey, Gabriel; Hearing Time: 3:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinute Order Attachment- Minute Order Attachment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • DocketCase Management Conference- Judicial Officer: Brickey, Gabriel; Hearing Time: 3:30 PM; Result: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Filed- 11/24/21 Notice of Case Management Conf.; Comment: of Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement Filed- 11/24/21 Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement Filed- 11/23/21 - Case Management Statement HRG 12/9/21; Comment: Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • DocketSummons and Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • DocketSummons and Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service- Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service- Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
66 More Docket Entries
  • 06/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement Filed- Case Management Statement; Comment: Plaintiff's CMC Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • DocketSummons and Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service- Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for Vincent G. Zaninovich, Jr. and Mary T. Zaninovich: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2021-08927 Vincent G. Zaninovich, Jr. and Mary T. Zaninovich $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for Vincent G. Zaninovich, Jr. and Mary T. Zaninovich: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • FinancialFinancial: Vincent G. Zaninovich, Jr. and Mary T. Zaninovich; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing- CV-48 Notice of Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for All Purposes; Comment: Notice of Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for All Purposes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed- Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Complaint filed- Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil case cover sheet- Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jaech, Jeffrey A.