This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 11/23/2021 at 16:32:34 (UTC).

Vilai Douangmala vs. Lennar Fresno, Inc. / COMPLEX

Case Summary

On 01/24/2020 Vilai Douangmala filed a Property - Construction Defect lawsuit against Lennar Fresno, Inc / COMPLEX. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Gaab, Kimberly and Tharpe, D Tyler. The case status is Other - Stayed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0302

  • Filing Date:

    01/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other - Stayed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Construction Defect

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Gaab, Kimberly

Tharpe, D Tyler

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Hicks, Tanya

Kaur, Baljinder

Douangmala, Vilai

Cook, Cynthia

Prado, Vennie

Khem, Cherry

Johnson, Ta Shaumi Luvell

Cook, Wayne

Khem, Im

Holguin, Christina

Singh, Mohit

Singh, Baljit

Malony, Collin

Chatman (Brown), Poursha

Brar, Jagdish

Defendants

Fresno, Inc., Lennar

Lennar Fresno, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Edwards, Lucas A

Defendant Attorney

King, Jonathan N.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Hearing

Notice of Hearing; Comment: Status Conference set for 12/3/2020

Order Received for Signature

Stipulation and Order; Comment: **Order signed and forwarded to clerk's office for further processing on 7/21/2020** PENDING REVIEW Forwarded to Dept. 503 Order for: Stipulation and (Proposed) Order to Stay Entire Action

Request for Dismissal Received - Pending Review

Request for Dismissal; Comment: Request for Dismissal

Notice of Hearing

Civil Document; Comment: rescheduled 5/26/2020 hearing to 8/25/2020 at 3:30 pm in Dept. 402

Decl of Good Faith Attempt Filed Automatic 30-day extension

Declaration; Comment: Pursuant to CCP 430.41

Stipulation and Order filed

Stipulation and Order filed; Judicial Officer: Gaab, Kimberly; Comment: Stipulation and Order to Stay Entire Action

Case Management Conference

CV-48 Notice of Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for All Purposes; Judicial Officer: Gaab, Kimberly; Hearing Time: 3:27 PM

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Notice Filed

Notice of Jury Deposit; Comment: Notice of Jury Deposit

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment; Comment: from chambers and clerk's certificate of mailing

Case Management Statement Filed

47849CaseMana00d28d7

Case Management Statement Filed

47112CaseMana0053769

Answer Filed

Answer/Response/Denial/Demurrer - No Fee

Stipulation and Order filed

Stipulation and Order filed; Judicial Officer: Gaab, Kimberly; Comment: lift stay

Order Received for Signature

Stipulation and Order; Comment: **fwd to clerk's office for further processing**Forwarded to Dept 503 Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Lifting Stay

Request for Dismissal Received - Pending Review

Request for Dismissal; Comment: Request for Dismissal; Proof of Service

Dismissal Not Entered

Request for Dismissal; Comment: Request for dismissal filed. Dismissal not entered as requested for the following reason: 1b a box has to be marked & #2 incomplete.

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment; Comment: from Chambers and Certificate of Mailing

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/17/2022
  • DocketStatus Conference- Judicial Officer: Gaab, Kimberly; Hearing Time: 3:28 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinute Order Attachment- Minute Order Attachment; Comment: from chambers and clerk's certificate of mailing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • DocketChambers Work- Pre- Judicial Officer: Gaab, Kimberly; Hearing Time: 5:30 PM; Result: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement Filed- 47849CaseMana00d28d7

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement Filed- 47112CaseMana0053769

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer Filed- Answer/Response/Denial/Demurrer - No Fee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for Lennar Fresno, Inc.: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2021-33084 Lennar Fresno, Inc. $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for Lennar Fresno, Inc.: Transaction Assessment $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketNotice or Order Vacating Stay

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStipulation and Order filed- Stipulation and Order filed; Judicial Officer: Gaab, Kimberly; Comment: lift stay

    Read MoreRead Less
30 More Docket Entries
  • 03/10/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for Douangmala, Vilai: Transaction Assessment $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Filed- Notice of Jury Deposit; Comment: Notice of Jury Deposit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAmendment filed- Amendment to Complaint; Comment: First Amendment to Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for Douangmala, Vilai: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2020-07064 Douangmala, Vilai $1435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for Douangmala, Vilai: Transaction Assessment $1435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • FinancialFinancial: Douangmala, Vilai; Total Financial Assessment $1,585.00; Total Payments and Credits $1,585.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • DocketNotice of Hearing- Comment: CMC set for 5/26/20 at 3:30pm. Assignment of Judge for all purposes.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed- Summons; Summons issued and filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil case cover sheet- Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Complaint filed- {{FilingCodeDescription}}

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Lennar Fresno, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jonathan N King