This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 11/06/2019 at 19:43:19 (UTC).

Veronica Gomez vs Sergio Hernandez

Case Summary

On 06/27/2019 a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce case was filed by Veronica Gomez against Sergio Hernandez in the jurisdiction of Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3639

  • Filing Date:

    06/27/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Diaz, Monica

Kalemkarian, David

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Gomez, Veronica L

Respondent

Hernandez, Sergio V

Minors

Hernandez, Ceriena J

Hernandez, Sergio J

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/01/2020
  • 1 Family - Centered Status Conference- Judicial Officer: Kalemkarian, David; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • Simplified Financial Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • Request to Enter Default- Comment: As to Sergio Hernandez

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • Documents sent to- Comment: (Default Desk) w/file

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • Proof of Service of Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • Summons issued and filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • Income and Expense Declaration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • Uniform Child Custody Jurisdiction Act

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • Petition for Dissolution with Children

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • Financial info for Gomez, Veronica L: Fee Waiver $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • Financial info for Gomez, Veronica L: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • Financial: Gomez, Veronica L; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less