This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 03/11/2023 at 08:02:32 (UTC).

U.S. Bank National Association vs. Jose Solano

Case Summary

On 01/06/2023 U S Bank National Association filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Jose Solano. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Fresno County BF Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0135

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

U.S. Bank National Association

Defendant

Solano, Jose

Kerman, CA 93630-1618

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Wallace, Douglas S.

 

Court Documents

1/6/2023 Complaint

01/06/2023: 1/6/2023 Complaint

1/6/2023 Summons

01/06/2023: 1/6/2023 Summons

1/6/2023 Civil Case Cover Sheet

01/06/2023: 1/6/2023 Civil Case Cover Sheet

01/11/23 Proof of Service

01/11/2023: 01/11/23 Proof of Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/11/2023
  • DocketSummons and Complaint; Served: 01/10/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • FinancialFinancial info for U.S. Bank National Association: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2023-01414 U.S. Bank National Association $225.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • FinancialFinancial info for U.S. Bank National Association: Transaction Assessment $225.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • FinancialFinancial: U.S. Bank National Association; Total Financial Assessment $225.00; Total Payments and Credits $225.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil case cover sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Complaint filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less