This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 02/24/2020 at 15:24:12 (UTC).

Tracy Biglay vs. Dante Mendoza

Case Summary

On 01/06/2020 Tracy Biglay filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Dante Mendoza. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0005

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Biglay, Tracy M.

Defendants

Gauthier, Susan

Mendoza, Dante Cruzaficio

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Plaintiff's Claim filed

Plaintiff's Claim filed

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/25/2020
  • Court Trial- Hearing Time: 8:45 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order SC- Comment: Fee:$40.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service- Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order SC- Comment: Fee: $40.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service- Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • Financial info for Biglay, Tracy M.: Counter Payment Receipt # CIVIL-2020-00000107 Biglay, Tracy M. $75.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • Financial info for Biglay, Tracy M.: Transaction Assessment $75.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • Financial: Biglay, Tracy M.; Total Financial Assessment $75.00; Total Payments and Credits $75.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • Cause Of Action- Action Plaintiff's Claim ; File Date: 01/06/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Plaintiff's Claim filed- Plaintiff's Claim filed

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.