This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 04/17/2022 at 07:16:02 (UTC).

Theodore Mooradian vs. State of California State Transportation Agency

Case Summary

On 08/26/2019 Theodore Mooradian filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against State of California State Transportation Agency. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Tharpe, D Tyler, Simpson, Alan, Culver Kapetan, Kristi, Hamilton, Jeffrey Y. and Gaab, Kimberly. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3115

  • Filing Date:

    08/26/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Tharpe, D Tyler

Simpson, Alan

Culver Kapetan, Kristi

Hamilton, Jeffrey Y.

Gaab, Kimberly

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Mooradian, Theodore B.

Defendants

State of California State Transportation Agency

Caltrans, a State Public Entity

California Department of Transportation

a State Public Entity

California Department of Transportation, dba Caltrans a State Public Entity

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Sagaser, Howard A

Defendant Attorney

Sims, W Christopher

 

Court Documents

Notice of Hearing

Notice of Hearing; Comment: *Department Change*

Notice Filed

Notice Filed; Comment: Notice of Assignment of Judge for all Purposes.

ADR Stipulation Mediation filed

Stipulation; Comment: Parties to engage in mediation. Mediator: Hon. Howard Broadman. Ret.

Notice Filed

Notice of Jury Deposit; Comment: of Jury Fees

Deposit, payment,disbursment

Deposit, payment,disbursment; Comment: Jury Fee For Defendant

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Case Management Statement Filed

Case Management Statement

Order Granted

Order Granted; Judicial Officer: Hamilton, Jeffrey Y.; Comment: Stipulation to Dismiss Defendant State of California State Transformation Agency (CalSTA), a State Public Entity, Without Prejudice.

Answer Filed

Answer/Response/Denial/Demurrer - First Appearance Fee

4/6/22 Proof of Service on Motion to Stay

04/06/2022: 4/6/22 Proof of Service on Motion to Stay

4/6/22 Proposed Order on Motion to Stay

04/06/2022: 4/6/22 Proposed Order on Motion to Stay

4/6/22 Declaration on Motion to Stay

04/06/2022: 4/6/22 Declaration on Motion to Stay

4/6/22 Request on Motion to Stay

04/06/2022: 4/6/22 Request on Motion to Stay

4/6/22 Memorandum of Points & Authorities on Motion to Stay

04/06/2022: 4/6/22 Memorandum of Points & Authorities on Motion to Stay

4/6/22 Notice of Motion to Stay

04/06/2022: 4/6/22 Notice of Motion to Stay

Amended Document Filed

03/29/2021: Amended Document Filed

Notice of Entry of Judgment

03/29/2021: Notice of Entry of Judgment

Notice of Entry of Judgment

03/29/2021: Notice of Entry of Judgment

88 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/22/2022
  • DocketJury Trial; Judicial Officer: Gaab, Kimberly; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Comment: Req by both: 6-15 Days

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • DocketTrial Readiness; Judicial Officer: Gaab, Kimberly; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • DocketMandatory Settlement Conference; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • DocketSummary Judgment; Judicial Officer: Culver Kapetan, Kristi; Hearing Time: 3:27 PM; Comment: Christopher Sims

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • DocketMotion - Stay; Judicial Officer: Culver Kapetan, Kristi; Hearing Time: 3:27 PM; Comment: Christopher Sims

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for California Department of Transportation: Government Exemption Claimed $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for California Department of Transportation: Transaction Assessment $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service; Comment: Re Motion. to Stay Action Pending Resolution of Related Petition for Writ of Admin. Mandate & Exhaustion of Admin. Remedies

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Received for Signature; Comment: **Pending Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration Filed; Comment: of Phillip S.O. Coonley ISO Motion to Stay

    Read MoreRead Less
93 More Docket Entries
  • 09/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service; Comment: Proof of Service by Mail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing; Comment: Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for all Purposes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • FinancialFinancial info for Mooradian, Theodore B.: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2019-68032 Mooradian, Theodore B. $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • FinancialFinancial info for Mooradian, Theodore B.: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • FinancialFinancial: Mooradian, Theodore B.; Total Financial Assessment $585.00; Total Payments and Credits $585.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Complaint filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil case cover sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/01/1900
  • DocketChambers Work- Pre; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CALTRANS is a litigant

Latest cases where CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer William Christopher Sims