This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 03/11/2020 at 01:53:15 (UTC).

William A. Neal Living Trust

Case Summary

On 06/10/2019 William A Neal Living Trust was filed as a Probate - Trust lawsuit. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Kazanjian, Debra. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0554

  • Filing Date:

    06/10/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Trust

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judge

Kazanjian, Debra

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Neal, Wendell A.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Seymour, Christopher E.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/06/2019
  • FinancialFinancial info for Neal, Wendell A.: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2019-88353 Neal, Wendell A. $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • FinancialFinancial info for Neal, Wendell A.: Transaction Assessment $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • DocketStipulation and Order- Comment: Stipulation Approving Payment of Attorney's Fees and Costs of Co-Trustee (NO ORDER REQUESTED-skm)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • DocketOrder (Generic)- Judicial Officer: Kazanjian, Debra; Comment: Order Approving First Account and Report of Wendell A. Neal and Discharge of Wendell A. Neal as Co-Trustee (cc emailed)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • DocketContinued Hearing by Court- Judicial Officer: Kazanjian, Debra; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Granted; Comment: First Account and Report of Co-Trustee; Petition for (1) Settlement of Account and Report of Co-Trustee; and (2) for Order Accepting Resignation of Co-Trustee and for Appointment of Successor Co-Trustee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • DocketContinued Hearing by Court- Judicial Officer: Kazanjian, Debra; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Dismissed; Comment: Petition for Instructions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • FinancialFinancial info for Neal, Wendell A.: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2019-82214 Neal, Wendell A. $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • FinancialFinancial info for Neal, Wendell A.: Transaction Assessment $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • DocketContinued Hearing by Court- Judicial Officer: Kazanjian, Debra; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Heard; Comment: Petition for Instructions

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 08/27/2019
  • DocketAccounting- Comment: First Account and Report of Co-Trustee; Petition for (1) Settlement of Account and Report of Co-Trustee; and (2) for Order Accepting Resignation of Co-Trustee and for Appointment of Successor Co-Trustee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • DocketContinued Hearing by Court- Judicial Officer: Kazanjian, Debra; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Continued Court's Motion; Comment: Petition for Instructions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • DocketObjection- Comment: Objection of James G. Neal to Petition of Co-Trustee for Instructions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • DocketPetition- Judicial Officer: Kazanjian, Debra; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Continued Court's Motion; Comment: Petition for Instructions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • DocketNotice of Hearing- Comment: Notice of Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • FinancialFinancial info for Neal, Wendell A.: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2019-45493 Neal, Wendell A. $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • FinancialFinancial info for Neal, Wendell A.: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • FinancialFinancial: Neal, Wendell A.; Total Financial Assessment $910.00; Total Payments and Credits $910.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • DocketDeclaration- Comment: Declaration of Wendell A. Neal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • DocketTrust Petition (Initial)- Comment: Petition for Instructions no orders

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.