This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 10/23/2020 at 08:16:59 (UTC).

The People of the State of California vs. Raymond Perez Jr

Case Summary

On 09/25/2020 The People of the State of California filed an Other lawsuit against Raymond Perez Jr. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Fresno Superior Courthouse Downtown located in Fresno, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Dalesandro, Samuel. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1772

  • Filing Date:

    09/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Fresno Superior Courthouse Downtown

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judge

Dalesandro, Samuel

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

The People of the State of California

Defendants

Perez, Raymond

Perez Jr, Raymond

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

District Attorney

Defendant Attorney

Public Defender

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/16/2020
  • DocketCourt Orders Clerk's Office to refer defendant to- Comment: Program: 9 month DUI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • DocketOriginal JUS 8715 completed and mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DispositionDisposition: Sentence- Fee Totals ; Due: 03/15/2021; ; $1,895.00 ; ; ; $50.00 ; ; Fee Totals; $1,945.00; Programs; Attend and Complete 9 Month Level 2 Alcohol Program; Ordered; Order Date: 10/14/2020; Comment: Enroll within 60 days; Probation; Type: Conditional Sentence; Start Date: 10/14/2020; Term: 3 Years; End Date: 10/13/2023; Imposition of Sentence Suspended; Status; Adult Confinement; Type: Fresno County Jail; Facility: Fresno County Jail; Start Date: 12/11/2020; Start Time: 7:00 PM; Term Type: Incarcerated; Term: 180 Days; Suspended: 160 Days; Suspended Reason: Referred to Adult Offender Work Program; DL Conditions; Type: Findings, Orders and Information; BAC/Drugs: Alcohol; BAC Level: 0.28; Comment: Install or obtain an exemption form within 30 days

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DispositionDisposition: Disposition- Judicial Officer: Dalesandro, Samuel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DispositionDisposition: Plea- Judicial Officer: Dalesandro, Samuel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for Perez Jr, Raymond: Transaction Assessment $1945.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • FinancialFinancial: Perez Jr, Raymond; Total Financial Assessment $1,945.00; Total Payments and Credits $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketDefendant Released on Probation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketCourt order Alcohol Assessment Program fee purs. to VC 23649- Comment: Amount: $100.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • Docket$4.00 EMAT Fee pursuant to AB 2173

    Read MoreRead Less
24 More Docket Entries
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketCopy of charging document received by Defendant- Comment: Document: Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketDefendant Agrees to Appear Remotely for Court Hearing- Comment: Defendant waives right to be physically present before a Judicial Officer.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketDistrict Attorney appearing on behalf of the People- Comment: Deputy District Attorney: K. Panosian

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketPublic Defender appearing with Defendant- Comment: Deputy Public Defender: E. Carbajal Defendant Present: Yes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketCourt appoints Public Defender to represent Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketProceedings recorded electronically at- Comment: Time: 10:34 am

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketArraignment- Judicial Officer: Dalesandro, Samuel; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard; Comment: Department 13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketCase Initiation Documents

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketCitation Filed- Comment: Citing Agency:Fresno Police Department Citation #:2887816

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketCharging Document - Formal Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less