This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 05/16/2022 at 16:06:00 (UTC).

The People of the State of California vs. Rafer Jamel Alston

Case Summary

On 04/18/2022 The People of the State of California filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Rafer Jamel Alston. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Fresno Superior Courthouse Downtown located in Fresno, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Conklin, Jonathan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****2681

  • Filing Date:

    04/18/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judge

Conklin, Jonathan

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

The People of the State of California

Defendants

Alston, Rafer Jamel

Alston, Rafer Jamel, JR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

District Attorney

Defendant Attorneys

Sok, Curtis

Benninghoff, Melina S

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/25/2022
  • DocketMotion - Bail - Pre; Judicial Officer: Conklin, Jonathan; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • DocketPre Prelim; Judicial Officer: Conklin, Jonathan; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • DocketPreliminary Hearing; Judicial Officer: Conklin, Jonathan; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Off Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • DocketCourt finds good cause; Comment: Finding: There is no condition or combination of conditions that will assure the defendant's presence of protect the safety of the victim (including alleged prostitutes in this case) or the community. Motion to set bail is denied without prejudice. Defendant remains in custody, No Bail.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • DocketTentative Preliminary Hearing date; Comment: Date: 6/10/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • DocketMotion; Comment: Submitting Party: Defense Type of Motion: Continuance Oral/Written: Oral

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • DocketDistrict Attorney appearing on behalf of the People; Comment: Deputy District Attorney: A. Paulson

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • DocketPrivate Counsel appearing on behalf of the Defendant; Comment: Attorney: Curtis Sok Defendant present: Yes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • DocketMotion - Bail - Pre; Judicial Officer: Conklin, Jonathan; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued at Request of Defense

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • DocketPre Prelim; Judicial Officer: Conklin, Jonathan; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued at Request of Defense

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 04/19/2022
  • DocketDefendant waives reading/advisement; Comment: The defendant waives reading of the complaining document, waives formal arraignment and waives reading of constitutional and statutory rights

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • DocketCopy of charging document received by Defendant; Comment: Document: Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • DocketDistrict Attorney appearing on behalf of the People; Comment: Deputy District Attorney: A. Paulson and A. Freeman

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • DocketPrivate Counsel appearing on behalf of the Defendant; Comment: Attorney: M. Benninghoff via zoom Defendant present: Yes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • DocketAttorney of Record set; Comment: Attorney: Melina Benninghoff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • DocketNotification of Canon; Comment: Notification consistent with California Code of Judicial Ethics Canon 3 E (2)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • DocketArraignment; Judicial Officer: Conklin, Jonathan; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard; Comment: Department 11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • DocketDefendant in Custody; Comment: Defendant is in custody at the Fresno County Jail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • DocketE-Charging Document - Formal Complaint Filed; Comment: IC 04/19/2022 Codefendant Case DA# 22-9153G

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2022
  • DocketOrder preventing defendant from release on bond PC 1275.1; Judicial Officer: Conklin, Jonathan; Comment: Pursuant to PC 1275.1 is granted. Judge: Jonathan Conklin Date: 04/10/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Melina Shalysse Benninghoff

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Sok, Curtis Bonghoon