This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 12/31/2019 at 08:11:43 (UTC).

The People of the State of California vs. Noel Nickolas Olivas

Case Summary

On 11/18/2019 The People of the State of California filed an Other lawsuit against Noel Nickolas Olivas. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Fresno Superior Courthouse Downtown located in Fresno, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Whitehead, Denise. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****7996

  • Filing Date:

    11/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Fresno Superior Courthouse Downtown

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judge

Whitehead, Denise

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

The People of the State of California

Defendant

Olivas, Noel Nickolas

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

District Attorney

Defendant Attorney

Public Defender

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/19/2019
  • Disposition: Sentence- Comment: (The Defendant's TIME CREDITS are as follows: Total: 2 Actual: 2 GTWT: 0 Treatment: 0); Fee Totals ; Due: 04/15/2020; ; $1,895.00 ; ; ; $50.00 ; ; Fee Totals; $1,945.00; Programs; Attend and Complete (SB38) 18 Month Alcohol Program; Party: Olivas, Noel Nickolas; Ordered; Order Date: 11/19/2019; Probation; Type: Conditional Sentence; Start Date: 11/19/2019; Term: 3 Years; End Date: 11/18/2022; Imposition of Sentence Suspended; Status; Adult Confinement; Type: Fresno County Jail; Facility: Fresno County Jail; Term Type: Incarcerated; Term: 364 Days; Stayed: 304 Days; Stayed Reason: On the condition defendant complies with Probation; Comment: Referred to SCRAMX; DL Conditions; Type: Findings, Orders and Information; BAC/Drugs: Alcohol; BAC Level: 0.24

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • Disposition: Disposition- Judicial Officer: Whitehead, Denise

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • Disposition: Plea- Judicial Officer: Whitehead, Denise

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • HearingDefendant remains on Probation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • HearingDefendant in compliance- Comment: Court finds the Defendant is in compliance with terms and conditions. Scram X / Alcoholics Anonymous

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • HearingDefendant provided proof- Comment: Proof: Scram X / Alcoholics Anonymous Count(s): 001

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • HearingDistrict Attorney appearing on behalf of the People- Comment: Deputy District Attorney: B. Aguayo

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • HearingPublic Defender appearing with Defendant- Comment: Deputy Public Defender: V. Nassar Defendant Present: Yes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • HearingProceedings recorded electronically at- Comment: Time: 9:43 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • HearingProbation Hearing - Review- Judicial Officer: Whitehead, Denise; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
36 More Docket Entries
  • 11/19/2019
  • HearingCourt appoints Public Defender to represent Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • HearingProceedings recorded electronically at- Comment: Time: 2:24 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • HearingArraignment- Judicial Officer: Whitehead, Denise; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard; Comment: D13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • HearingCase Initiation Documents

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • HearingProsecution indicates defendant has prior DUI conviction(s).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • HearingFingerprint on Citation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • HearingCitation Filed- Comment: Citing Agency:Fresno County Detention Facility Citation #:S156406

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • HearingCharging Document - Formal Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • Financial info for Olivas, Noel Nickolas: Transaction Assessment $1945.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • Financial: Olivas, Noel Nickolas; Total Financial Assessment $1,945.00; Total Payments and Credits $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.