This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 05/05/2020 at 08:07:04 (UTC).

The People of the State of California vs. Michael Isaac Tapia

Case Summary

On 04/07/2020 The People of the State of California filed an Other lawsuit against Michael Isaac Tapia. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Fresno Superior Courthouse Downtown located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are de Alba, Ana and Jones, Heather M. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****4529

  • Filing Date:

    04/07/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Fresno Superior Courthouse Downtown

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

de Alba, Ana

Jones, Heather M

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

The People of the State of California

Defendants

Tapia, Michael Isacc

Tapia, Michael Isaac

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

District Attorney

Defendant Attorney

Public Defender

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/15/2020
  • DispositionDisposition: Disposition- Judicial Officer: Jones, Heather M

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • DocketJUS 8715- Comment: Mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • DocketDefendant Released on all Counts

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • DocketMotion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • DocketMotion- Comment: Submitting Party: People Type of Motion: Dismissal Oral/Written: Oral

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • DocketDistrict Attorney appearing on behalf of the People- Comment: Deputy District Attorney: K. Rollins

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • DocketPublic Defender appearing with Defendant- Comment: Deputy Public Defender: D. Quigley Defendant Present: Yes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • DocketArraignment- Judicial Officer: Jones, Heather M; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2020
  • DocketDefendant remanded into custody- Comment: Bail Set at Amount: $20,000.00 Convicted: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2020
  • DocketDefendant ordered to be present at next hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 04/08/2020
  • DocketDefendant ordered to be present at next hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • DocketCourt finds- Comment: Finding: Good cause to continue arraignment.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • DocketDistrict Attorney not present

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • DocketDefendant is not present

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • DocketArraignment- Judicial Officer: Jones, Heather M; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued Upon Court's Own Motion; Comment: Dept. 96

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • DocketCase Initiation Documents

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • DocketJUS 8715- Comment: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • DocketCase has been designated a Domestic Violence filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • DocketDefendant in Custody- Comment: Defendant is in custody at the Fresno County Jail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • DocketCharging Document - Formal Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.