This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 10/23/2020 at 08:23:06 (UTC).

The People of the State of California vs. Martin Infante

Case Summary

On 09/25/2020 The People of the State of California filed an Other lawsuit against Martin Infante. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Fresno Superior Courthouse Downtown located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Diaz, Monica and Skiles, Jon M. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1752

  • Filing Date:

    09/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Fresno Superior Courthouse Downtown

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Diaz, Monica

Skiles, Jon M

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

The People of the State of California

Defendants

Ortega, Martin

Infante, Martin

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

District Attorney

Defendant Attorney

Public Defender

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/26/2020
  • DocketArraignment- Judicial Officer: Skiles, Jon M; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketDefendant remains in custody at Fresno County Jail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketDefendant ordered to be present at next hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketDefendant waived statutory time- Comment: Hearing Type: Arraignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketCase to trail another case- Comment: Case number: F20904850

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketMotion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketMotion- Comment: Submitting Party: Defense Type of Motion: Requesting to continue Oral/Written: Oral

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketDefendant Agrees to Appear Remotely for Court Hearing- Comment: Defendant waives right to be physically present before a Judicial Officer.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketDistrict Attorney appearing on behalf of the People- Comment: Deputy District Attorney: A. Guillermo

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketPublic Defender appearing with Defendant- Comment: Deputy Public Defender: H. Mukhils Defendant Present: Yes

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketPublic Defender appearing with Defendant- Comment: Deputy Public Defender: L Davila Defendant Present: Yes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketCourt appoints Public Defender to represent Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketNotification of Canon- Comment: Notification consistent with California Code of Judicial Ethics Canon 3 E (2)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketDefendant Agrees to Appear Remotely for Court Hearing- Comment: Defendant waives right to be physically present before a Judicial Officer.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketProceedings recorded electronically at- Comment: Time: 10:23am

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketArraignment- Judicial Officer: Diaz, Monica; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued at Request of Defense; Comment: Department 12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketCase Initiation Documents

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketJUS8715 Received

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketDistrict Attorney Memo Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketCharging Document - Formal Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less