This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 12/16/2019 at 08:07:19 (UTC).

The People of the State of California vs. Lashaira Carolina Chavez

Case Summary

On 11/18/2019 The People of the State of California filed an Other lawsuit against Lashaira Carolina Chavez. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Fresno Superior Courthouse Downtown located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Whitehead, Denise and Kelley, James A, JR. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****7982

  • Filing Date:

    11/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Fresno Superior Courthouse Downtown

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Whitehead, Denise

Kelley, James A, JR

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

The People of the State of California

Defendant

Chavez, Lashaira Carolina

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

District Attorney

Defendant Attorney

Ciummo & Associates

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/20/2019
  • DispositionDisposition: Disposition- Judicial Officer: Kelley, James A, JR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • HearingJUS 8715- Comment: Mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • HearingDefendant released on this case only

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • HearingDefendant Released on all Counts

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • HearingMotion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • HearingMotion- Comment: Submitting Party: People Type of Motion: Dismissal, Violation of Probation Admission in case F17901727 Oral/Written: Oral

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • HearingDistrict Attorney appearing on behalf of the People- Comment: Deputy District Attorney: A. Wilson

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • HearingCiummo and Associates appearing on behalf of Defendant- Comment: Attorney: P. Brickey Defendant present: Yes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • HearingAttorney conflict; new counsel appointed- Comment: It appearing there is an attorney conflict. New counsel is appointed. Attorney appointed: Ciummo and Associates

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • HearingArraignment- Judicial Officer: Kelley, James A, JR; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 11/19/2019
  • HearingMotion- Comment: Submitting Party: Court Type of Motion: Continuance and trail Felony Oral/Written: Oral

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • HearingDistrict Attorney appearing on behalf of the People- Comment: Deputy District Attorney: D. Bethel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • HearingDefendant is not present

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • HearingText:- Comment: Not Recorded

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • HearingArraignment- Judicial Officer: Kelley, James A, JR; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued at Request of Defense

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • HearingArraignment- Judicial Officer: Whitehead, Denise; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued Upon Court's Own Motion; Comment: Dept 13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • HearingCase Initiation Documents

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • HearingJUS 8715- Comment: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • HearingDefendant in Custody- Comment: Defendant is in custody at the Fresno County Jail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • HearingCharging Document - Formal Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.