This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 11/18/2021 at 16:09:02 (UTC).

The People of the State of California vs. Brian Clay, JR

Case Summary

On 10/21/2021 The People of the State of California filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Brian Clay, JR. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Fresno Superior Courthouse Downtown located in Fresno, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Kelley, James A, JR. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****8251

  • Filing Date:

    10/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judge

Kelley, James A, JR

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

The People of the State of California

Defendant

Clay, Brian, JR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

District Attorney

Defendant Attorney

Little, Kevin G.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/07/2021
  • DocketPre Prelim- Judicial Officer: Kelley, James A, JR; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • DispositionDisposition: Plea- Judicial Officer: Kelley, James A, JR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • DocketViolation of Pre-Trial Release Advisement- Comment: Pursuant to Penal Code Section 1318 the defendant acknowledges he or she has been informed of the consequences and the penalties applicable to violating the conditions of his or her release. If the Probation Officer has probable cause to believe the defendant is violating the terms and conditions of his or her pretrial release, the Probation Officer may arrest the defendant with or without a warrant and bring the defendant before the Court.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • DocketDefendant Released on Pre-Trial Release

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • Docket60 day rule:- Comment: Remains

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • Docket10 day rule:- Comment: Waived

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • DocketDefendant ordered to be present at next hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • DocketTentative Preliminary Hearing date- Comment: Date: 12/14/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • DocketTime Out Date:- Comment: 12/21/2021-Preliminary Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • DocketDefendant denies all enhancements and priors

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 10/22/2021
  • DocketPrivate Counsel appearing on behalf of the Defendant- Comment: Attorney: K. Little Defendant present: Yes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • DocketAttorney of Record set- Comment: Attorney: Kevin Little

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • DocketProceedings recorded electronically at- Comment: Time:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • DocketArraignment- Judicial Officer: Kelley, James A, JR; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard; Comment: Department 32

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketCase Initiation Documents

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketJUS8715 Received

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketDefendant in Custody- Comment: Defendant is in custody at the Fresno County Jail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketHeld to Answer Form Received

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketBail Amount Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketCharging Document - Formal Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Little, Kevin G.