This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 04/28/2022 at 04:38:35 (UTC).

The Garment Restoration Company vs. Margarito Mariscal

Case Summary

On 09/10/2021 The Garment Restoration Company filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Margarito Mariscal. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7127

  • Filing Date:

    09/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

The Garment Restoration Company

Defendants

Mariscal, Margarito

Mariscal, Guadalupe

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Landsman, Philip

 

Court Documents

Civil Complaint filed

47032Complain00f7f53

Civil case cover sheet

47032CivilCas024a653

Summons issued and filed

47032SummonsS01fbaba

47032Complain00f7f53

09/10/2021: 47032Complain00f7f53

47032CivilCas024a653

09/10/2021: 47032CivilCas024a653

47032SummonsS01fbaba

09/21/2021: 47032SummonsS01fbaba

04/25/22- Request for Entry of Default (DENIED)

04/25/2022: 04/25/22- Request for Entry of Default (DENIED)

04/25/22- Proof of Service.- Guadalupe Mariscal

04/25/2022: 04/25/22- Proof of Service.- Guadalupe Mariscal

04/25/22- Proof of Service- Margarito Mariscal

04/25/2022: 04/25/22- Proof of Service- Margarito Mariscal

4/26/2022- Request For Entry of Default

04/26/2022: 4/26/2022- Request For Entry of Default

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Enter Default Denied; Comment: Person listed on item #6(b)(2)as receiving default request (C/O) is not the attorney of record not legal guardian of record.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • DocketSummons and Complaint; Served: 10/04/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • DocketSummons and Complaint; Served: 09/26/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Enter Default Denied; Comment: Line 1.a is incorrect. Line 6.b (2) names listed do not match line 1.c. Counsel listed on Line 6.b(2) has not appeared or is not listed as attorney of record for defendants.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for The Garment Restoration Company: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2021-59569 The Garment Restoration Company $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for The Garment Restoration Company: Transaction Assessment $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • FinancialFinancial: The Garment Restoration Company; Total Financial Assessment $225.00; Total Payments and Credits $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil case cover sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Complaint filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THE GARMENT RESTORATION COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LANDSMAN PHILIP LAW OFFICES OF