This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 07/31/2020 at 06:32:58 (UTC).

Ellamae Coelho Living Trust dated December 4, 2000

Case Summary

On 02/24/2020 Ellamae Coelho Living Trust dated December 4, 2000 was filed as a Probate - Trust lawsuit. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Kazanjian, Debra. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0172

  • Filing Date:

    02/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Trust

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judge

Kazanjian, Debra

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Bickel, Bruce D.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Stein, Daniel C.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/08/2020
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • DocketOrder on Trust Petition- Judicial Officer: Kazanjian, Debra; Comment: Order Approving Compromise and Settlement of Claims and Dismissal of Case cc emailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • DocketContinued Hearing by Court- Judicial Officer: Kazanjian, Debra; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Granted; Comment: Verified Petition for Order Approving Compromise and Settlement of Claims and Dismissal of Case

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2020
  • DocketNotice of Hearing- Comment: Hearing: 6/15/2020 Time: 9:00 a.m. Dept.: 303

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2020
  • DocketNotice of Hearing- Comment: Hearing: 6/15/2020 Time: 9:00 a.m. Dept.: 3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2020
  • DocketPetition- Judicial Officer: Kazanjian, Debra; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Off Calendar; Comment: Verified Petition for Order Approving Compromise and Settlment of Claims and Dismissal of Case

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2020
  • DocketClerk's Notice Filed- Comment: Notice of Changed Calendar Setting

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • DocketNotice of Hearing- Comment: Notice of Hearing - Decedent's Estate or Trust

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for Bickel, Bruce D.: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2020-15181 Bickel, Bruce D. $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for Bickel, Bruce D.: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • FinancialFinancial: Bickel, Bruce D.; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • DocketTrust Petition (Initial)- Comment: Verified Petition for Order Approving Compromise and Settlment of Claims and Dismissal of Case

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer STEIN, DANIEL C.