This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 04/14/2020 at 01:04:15 (UTC).

The Albert Leroy Galindo Living Trust, dated April 28, 2009, as amended and restated in its entirety on January 31, 2019

Case Summary

On 11/18/2019 The Albert Leroy Galindo Living Trust, dated April 28, 2009, as amended and restated in its entirety on January 31, 2019 was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1139

  • Filing Date:

    11/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

LaBrucherie, Stephanie

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Johnson, Summer A

Webb, Melissa E.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/10/2019
  • DocketProof of Publication- Comment: Declaration of Publication

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • FinancialFinancial info for LaBrucherie, Stephanie: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2019-91677 LaBrucherie, Stephanie $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • FinancialFinancial info for LaBrucherie, Stephanie: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • FinancialFinancial: LaBrucherie, Stephanie; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • DocketNotice Filed- Comment: Notice to Creditors

    Read MoreRead Less