This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 11/20/2022 at 02:44:47 (UTC).

TD Bank USA, N.A. vs. Hitendra Patel

Case Summary

On 09/22/2022 TD Bank USA, N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Hitendra Patel. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Fresno County BF Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6631

  • Filing Date:

    09/22/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TD Bank USA, N.A.

Defendant

Patel, Hitendra

Fresno, CA 93720-3943

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Thomas, Vanessa

 

Court Documents

9/22/2022 - Complaint

09/22/2022: 9/22/2022 - Complaint

9/22/2022 - Summons

09/22/2022: 9/22/2022 - Summons

9/22/2022 - Civil Case Cover Sheet

09/22/2022: 9/22/2022 - Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/22/2022 - Declaration Re: Venue

09/22/2022: 9/22/2022 - Declaration Re: Venue

9/27/2022 - Proof of Service

09/27/2022: 9/27/2022 - Proof of Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/27/2022
  • DocketSummons and Complaint; Served: 09/27/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for TD Bank USA, N.A.: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2022-58995 TD Bank USA, N.A. $225.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for TD Bank USA, N.A.: Transaction Assessment $225.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • FinancialFinancial: TD Bank USA, N.A.; Total Financial Assessment $225.00; Total Payments and Credits $225.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration Filed; Comment: Re: Venue

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil case cover sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Complaint filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TD Bank, NA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer THOMAS VANESSA