This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 11/26/2021 at 23:02:01 (UTC).

SVM Enterprises, LLC vs. Grigor Oganesyan / UD

Case Summary

On 04/28/2021 SVM Enterprises, LLC filed a Property - Commercial Eviction lawsuit against Grigor Oganesyan / UD. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Cullers, Mark. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1192

  • Filing Date:

    04/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Commercial Eviction

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judge

Cullers, Mark

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SVM Enterprises, LLC

Defendants

Oganesyan, Grigor

OKM Medi-Cal Transportation

OKM Logistics, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Whelan, Brian D

 

Court Documents

Civil case cover sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Unlawful Detainer Complaint filed

Unlawful Detainer Complaint Filed

Unlawful Detainer Supplemental Cover Sheet

Unlawful Detainer Supplemental Cover Sheet

Summons issued and filed

Summons

Proof of Service

Proof of Service; Comment: Proof of Service Summons - Grigor Oganesyan dba OKM Medi-Cal Transportation

Proof of Service

Proof of Service; Comment: Proof of Service Summons - OKM Logistic Inc.

Request to Enter Default

Request for Entry of Default

Request to Enter Default

Request for Entry of Default

Request to Enter Default Denied

Request for Entry of Default; Comment: as to Griogr Oganesyan - Default previously entered

Request to Enter Default Denied

Request for Entry of Default; Comment: as to OKM Logistics, Inc. - Default previously entered

Judgment Received

Judgment; Comment: **Judgment signed and forwarded to clerk's office for further processing**Forwarded to Dept. 404

Declaration Filed

Declaration; Comment: Declaration of Rachel Monaco in Support of Application for Entry of Judgment

Writ of Execution Issued

Writ of Possession Issued; Comment: County: Fresno Amount: $15,075 and Writ of Possession

Writ Satisfied - Possession Only

Writ Satisfied - Possession Only

Writ Satisfied - Possession Only

Writ Satisfied - Possession Only

Writ of Execution Issued

Writ of Execution Issued; Comment: County: Fresno Amount: $15,075.00

Judgment

Default Judgment by Court; Judicial Officer: Cullers, Mark; Judgment Type: Default Judgment by Court; Party Names: SVM Enterprises, LLC; Oganesyan, Grigor; OKM Logistics, Inc.; Unlawful Detainer; Awarded To:; SVM Enterprises, LLC; Entitled to Possession of Premises at:; 6366 N. Figarden Drive, Suite 114 and Suite 105, Fresno, California 93722; Judgment Applies to All Occupants; The Rental Agreement Is Cancelled; The Lease Is Forfeited; Other: ************* ALL OCCUPANTS NOT SERVED *****************; Awarded Against:; Oganesyan, Grigor; OKM Logistics, Inc.; Must Pay; Past Due Rent: $12,000.00; Holdover Damages: $1,100.00; Attorney Fees: $1,500.00; Costs: $435.00; Total: $15,035.00

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/08/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for SVM Enterprises, LLC: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2021-42108 SVM Enterprises, LLC $40.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for SVM Enterprises, LLC: Transaction Assessment $40.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Execution Issued- Writ of Execution Issued; Comment: County: Fresno Amount: $15,075.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit Satisfied - Possession Only- Writ Satisfied - Possession Only

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit Satisfied - Possession Only- Writ Satisfied - Possession Only

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for SVM Enterprises, LLC: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2021-37246 SVM Enterprises, LLC $40.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for SVM Enterprises, LLC: Transaction Assessment $40.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Execution Issued- Writ of Possession Issued; Comment: County: Fresno Amount: $15,075 and Writ of Possession

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment- Default Judgment by Court; Judicial Officer: Cullers, Mark; Judgment Type: Default Judgment by Court; Party Names: SVM Enterprises, LLC; Oganesyan, Grigor; OKM Logistics, Inc.; Unlawful Detainer; Awarded To:; SVM Enterprises, LLC; Entitled to Possession of Premises at:; 6366 N. Figarden Drive, Suite 114 and Suite 105, Fresno, California 93722; Judgment Applies to All Occupants; The Rental Agreement Is Cancelled; The Lease Is Forfeited; Other: ************* ALL OCCUPANTS NOT SERVED *****************; Awarded Against:; Oganesyan, Grigor; OKM Logistics, Inc.; Must Pay; Past Due Rent: $12,000.00; Holdover Damages: $1,100.00; Attorney Fees: $1,500.00; Costs: $435.00; Total: $15,035.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketChambers Work- Pre- Judicial Officer: Cullers, Mark; Hearing Time: 5:30 PM; Result: Chambers Work - Order Submitted for Consideration

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 05/07/2021
  • DocketSummons and Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service- Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service- Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for SVM Enterprises, LLC: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2021-26040 SVM Enterprises, LLC $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for SVM Enterprises, LLC: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • FinancialFinancial: SVM Enterprises, LLC; Total Financial Assessment $515.00; Total Payments and Credits $515.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed- Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUnlawful Detainer Supplemental Cover Sheet- Unlawful Detainer Supplemental Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUnlawful Detainer Complaint filed- Unlawful Detainer Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil case cover sheet- Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Whelan, Brian D