This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 07/29/2020 at 18:41:57 (UTC).

Susana Sanchez vs. Wonderful Pistachios & Almonds, LLC

Case Summary

On 01/09/2020 Susana Sanchez filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Wonderful Pistachios Almonds, LLC. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Gaab, Kimberly and Tharpe, D Tyler. The case status is Other - Stayed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0111

  • Filing Date:

    01/09/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other - Stayed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Gaab, Kimberly

Tharpe, D Tyler

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Sanchez, Susana

Defendants

Wonderful Pistachios & Almonds, LLC

Campos, Juan

Dennison, Caleb

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Wagner, Nicholas

Defendant Attorney

Pecht, J.P.

 

Court Documents

Declaration Filed

Declaration; Comment: Of J.p. Pecht in Support of Motion to Compel Arbitration

Notice of Motion

Notice of Motion; Comment: Motion to Compel Arbitration and Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Notice of Hearing

Notice of Hearing; Comment: of Case Management Conference hearing and assignment of Judge for all purposes

Summons issued and filed

Summons; Summons issued and filed

Summons issued and filed

Summons; Summons issued and filed

Deposit, payment,disbursment

Declaration; Comment: of Jury Fees

Civil Complaint filed

Complaint

Civil case cover sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Minute Order Attachment (Tentative Rulings Only)

Minute Order Attachment (Tentative Rulings Only); Comment: and Certificate of Mailing

Case Management Statement Filed

Case Management Statement; Comment: Case Management Statement

Notice of Hearing

Notice of Hearing; Comment: of Case Management Conference set for 07/29/2020 at 03:30 p.m. in Dept. 402

Order Received for Signature

3549027_597ProposedO; Comment: ***PENDNG***

Declaration Filed

Declaration of Plaintiff Susana Sanchez in Support of Opposi; Comment: Declaration of Plaintiff Susana Sanchez in Support of Opposition to Motion to Compel Arbitration

Notice Filed

Notice Filed; Comment: of Calendar Setting and Certificate of Mailing **Petition - Compel Arbitration set for 05/07/20 is continued to 7/24/20**

Notice of Hearing

Civil Document

Case Management Statement Filed

Case Management Statement

Declaration Filed

Declaration; Comment: OF Silvana Hernandez in support of Motion to Compel Arbitration and Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketArbitration Status Conference- Judicial Officer: Gaab, Kimberly; Hearing Time: 3:28 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • DocketCase Management Conference- Judicial Officer: Tharpe, D Tyler; Hearing Time: 3:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Case Stayed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • DocketNotice or Order Staying Action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinute Order Attachment (Tentative Rulings Only)- Minute Order Attachment (Tentative Rulings Only); Comment: and Certificate of Mailing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • DocketChambers Work- Pre- Judicial Officer: Gaab, Kimberly; Hearing Time: 5:30 PM; Result: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinute Order Attachment- Minute Order Attachment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • DocketTaken Under Submission or Advisement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • DocketPetition - Compel Arbitration- Judicial Officer: Gaab, Kimberly; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Heard; Comment: J.P. Pecht

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement Filed- Case Management Statement; Comment: Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing- Notice of Hearing; Comment: of Case Management Conference set for 07/29/2020 at 03:30 p.m. in Dept. 402

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketSummons and Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service- Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for Sanchez, Susana: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2020-02554 Sanchez, Susana $585.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for Sanchez, Susana: Transaction Assessment $585.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • FinancialFinancial: Sanchez, Susana; Total Financial Assessment $585.00; Total Payments and Credits $585.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing- Notice of Hearing; Comment: of Case Management Conference hearing and assignment of Judge for all purposes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed- Summons; Summons issued and filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeposit, payment,disbursment- Declaration; Comment: of Jury Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Complaint filed- Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil case cover sheet- Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WONDERFUL PISTACHIOS & ALMONDS, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Pecht, J.P.