This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 05/11/2023 at 00:35:53 (UTC).

Summer Mitchell vs Dylan Sanchez

Case Summary

On 01/03/2023 Summer Mitchell filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Dylan Sanchez. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Fresno County BF Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Whalen, Robert, Skiles, Jon M and Hamilton, Jeffrey Y.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0014

  • Filing Date:

    01/03/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Whalen, Robert

Skiles, Jon M

Hamilton, Jeffrey Y.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Mitchell, Summer

Defendants

Sanchez, Dylan Paul

Sanchez, Dylan P

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Busick, Mark B.

Defendant Attorney

Grandy, Allison L

 

Court Documents

1-3-23 Civil Case Cover Sheet

01/03/2023: 1-3-23 Civil Case Cover Sheet

1-3-23 Complaint

01/03/2023: 1-3-23 Complaint

1-4-23 Summons

01/04/2023: 1-4-23 Summons

1-4-23 Notice of Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for All Purposes

01/04/2023: 1-4-23 Notice of Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for All Purposes

1/10/23 - Proof of Service - Dylan

01/10/2023: 1/10/23 - Proof of Service - Dylan

CV-47A Notice of Assignment of Judge For All Purposes w/Clerk Cert

01/17/2023: CV-47A Notice of Assignment of Judge For All Purposes w/Clerk Cert

2-1-23 Answer

02/01/2023: 2-1-23 Answer

NTC OF POSTING JURY FEES -.pdf

02/01/2023: NTC OF POSTING JURY FEES -.pdf

4/25/23 Stipulation re ADR

04/25/2023: 4/25/23 Stipulation re ADR

4/25/23 Case Management Statement

04/25/2023: 4/25/23 Case Management Statement

4/25/23 Pltf's Notice of Jury Deposit

04/25/2023: 4/25/23 Pltf's Notice of Jury Deposit

5/3/23 Association of Counsel

05/03/2023: 5/3/23 Association of Counsel

5/3/23 Substitution of Attorney

05/03/2023: 5/3/23 Substitution of Attorney

Minute Order Attachment

05/04/2023: Minute Order Attachment

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/21/2025
  • DocketJury Trial; Judicial Officer: Hamilton, Jeffrey Y.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2025
  • DocketTrial Readiness; Judicial Officer: Hamilton, Jeffrey Y.; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2024
  • DocketMandatory Settlement Conference; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2023
  • DocketRemote Appearance Via Courtcall; Comment: N. Urgesi appeared on behalf of M. Busick

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinute Order Attachment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Whalen, Robert; Hearing Time: 3:30 PM; Result: Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney Filed; Comment: Substitution of Attorney: New Attorney: Allison Grandy Old Attorney: Tomas Ross

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAssociation of Attorney filed; Comment: Association of Counsel

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2023
  • FinancialFinancial info for Mitchell, Summer: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2023-27965 Mitchell, Summer $150.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2023
  • FinancialFinancial info for Mitchell, Summer: Transaction Assessment $150.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 01/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Filed; Comment: Assignment of Judge for All Purposes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • DocketSummons and Complaint; Served: 01/06/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • FinancialFinancial info for Mitchell, Summer: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2023-00649 Mitchell, Summer $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • FinancialFinancial info for Mitchell, Summer: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • FinancialFinancial: Mitchell, Summer; Total Financial Assessment $585.00; Total Payments and Credits $585.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Filed; Comment: Notice of Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for All Purpose (emailed)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Complaint filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil case cover sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less