This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 09/27/2020 at 08:25:44 (UTC).

Sue Her vs. Centex Homes/COMPLEX

Case Summary

On 10/03/2019 Sue Her filed a Property - Construction Defect lawsuit against Centex Homes/COMPLEX. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are McGuire, Rosemary and Tharpe, D Tyler. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3604

  • Filing Date:

    10/03/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Construction Defect

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

McGuire, Rosemary

Tharpe, D Tyler

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Bassi, Santokh S.

Bassi, Charanpreet S.

Rodriguez, Crystal

Mangat, Charanjit K.

Johnson, Robert E.

Pablo, Teresita

Rodriguez, Patrick P.

Gill, Satpinder S.

Gill, Navkiran K.

Blanco, Jerome

Cortez, Alicia O.

Pablo, Paulino N.

Sell, Robert

Singh, Jaspreet

Her, Sue

Defendants and Cross Defendants

Centex Homes

Plute Home

Pulte Home Company, LLC

Centex Real Estate Company, LLC

Centex Real Estate Corporation

90 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Guthrie, Lori J

Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorney

Schaeffer, Sandra

Other Attorneys

McClain, Robyn S.

Koper, Jacob

Gorman, Patrick J.

McElroy, Julie D.

Beam, August A. P.

Hebesha, Amanda G.

Gordon, Gregory H

Heller, Elliot H

Kirkpatrick, Cheryl A

 

Court Documents

Answer Filed

Answer/Response/Denial/Demurrer - First Appearance Fee

Association of Attorney filed

Association of Attorney/Counsel; Comment: Association of Attorney - Murchison & Cumming, LLP are hereby associated

Summons issued and filed

Summons

Notice Filed

Notice; Comment: Plaintiffs' First Notice of Compliance

Cross Complaint Filed

Cross Action/Cross Complaint (No Fee); Comment: 2nd Cross-Complaint filed.

Answer Filed

SKM_95820082414520.pdf

Notice Filed

Notice of Jury Deposit; Comment: CVC Construction Corp.'s Demand For Jury Trial And Notice Of Posting of Jury Fees

Answer Filed

Answer/Response/Denial/Demurrer - First Appearance Fee

Answer Filed

Answer/Response/Denial/Demurrer - First Appearance Fee; Comment: Answer to Cross-Complaint

115 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/08/2020
  • DocketCase Management Conference- Judicial Officer: McGuire, Rosemary; Hearing Time: 3:28 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketMotion - Intervene- Judicial Officer: McGuire, Rosemary; Hearing Time: 3:27 PM; Comment: Julie Ncelroy

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketMotion - Intervene- Judicial Officer: McGuire, Rosemary; Hearing Time: 3:27 PM; Comment: Julie Ncelroy

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketMotion - Intervene- Judicial Officer: McGuire, Rosemary; Hearing Time: 3:27 PM; Comment: Julie Ncelroy

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Filed- Notice; Comment: Plaintiffs' First Notice of Compliance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAssociation of Attorney filed- Association of Attorney/Counsel; Comment: Association of Attorney - Murchison & Cumming, LLP are hereby associated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for Professional Cabinet Solutions: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2020-56600 Professional Cabinet Solutions $1435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for Professional Cabinet Solutions: Transaction Assessment $1435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • FinancialFinancial: Professional Cabinet Solutions; Total Financial Assessment $1,435.00; Total Payments and Credits $1,435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer Filed- SKM_95820082414520.pdf

    Read MoreRead Less
272 More Docket Entries
  • 11/25/2019
  • FinancialFinancial info for Her, Sue: Transaction Assessment $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Filed- Notice of Jury Deposit; Comment: Notice Of deposit of jury fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAmendment filed- Amendment to Complaint; Comment: Plaintiffs' First Amendment to Complaint Naming Additional Homeowners

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • FinancialFinancial info for Her, Sue: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2019-78988 Her, Sue $1435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • FinancialFinancial info for Her, Sue: Transaction Assessment $1435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • FinancialFinancial: Her, Sue; Total Financial Assessment $1,585.00; Total Payments and Credits $1,585.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing- Notice of Hearing; Comment: CMC set for 2/5/20 at 3:30pm. Assignment of Judge for all purposes.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed- Summons; Summons issued and filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Complaint filed- Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil case cover sheet- Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CENTEX REAL ESTATE COMPANY, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Centex Homes n/k/a Pulte Home Company, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Pulte Home Company, LLC, successor by conversion of Pulte Home Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Robyn S McClain