This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 02/19/2020 at 06:52:11 (UTC).

Steven Gary Fernandes (Estate)

Case Summary

On 06/17/2019 Steven Gary Fernandes Estate was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Kazanjian, Debra. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0573

  • Filing Date:

    06/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judge

Kazanjian, Debra

 

Party Details

Petitioners and Administrators

Fernandes, Steven, II

Fernandes, Stephanie

Decedents

Fernandes, Steven Gary

Fernandes, Steven G.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/28/2020
  • DocketProbate Status Hearing- Judicial Officer: Kazanjian, Debra; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Comment: Probate Status Hearing Status RE: Filing of the First or Final Account

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • DocketProbate Status Hearing- Judicial Officer: Kazanjian, Debra; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Off Calendar; Comment: Probate Status Hearing Status RE: Filing of the Inventory and Appraisal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2019
  • DocketCreditor's Claim- Comment: Amount: $55,744.18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • DocketInventory and Appraisal (Final)- Comment: Total Amount: $283,393.67

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • DocketCreditor's Claim- Comment: Amount: $530.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • DocketNotice Filed- Comment: Notice to Department of Health Care Services

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • DocketNotice Filed- Comment: Notice to Franchise Tax Board

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • DocketCreditor's Claim- Comment: Amount: $684.90

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • DocketProbate Status Hearing- Judicial Officer: Kazanjian, Debra; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Off Calendar; Comment: Probate Status Hearing Status RE: Filing of the Bond

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • FinancialFinancial info for Fernandes, Steven, II: Counter Payment Receipt # PR-2019-00002997 Certified copies $51.00

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 07/24/2019
  • DocketDuties and Liabilities (Estates)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • DocketProof of Publication

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • DocketWaiver of Bond by Heir or Beneficiary

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • DocketNotice of Petition to Administer Estate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • FinancialFinancial info for Fernandes, Steven, II: Counter Payment Receipt # PR-2019-00002227 Stephanie Fernandes $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • FinancialFinancial info for Fernandes, Steven, II: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • FinancialFinancial: Fernandes, Steven, II; Total Financial Assessment $486.00; Total Payments and Credits $486.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • DocketWaiver of Bond by Heir or Beneficiary- Comment: /s/ Steven Fernandes, II

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • DocketWaiver of Bond by Heir or Beneficiary- Comment: /s/ Stephanie Fernandes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • DocketPetition for Probate (Initial)- Comment: Petition for Letters of Administration; Authorization to Administer Under the IAEA (no orders and letters)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.