Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 05/11/2021 at 12:06:03 (UTC).

State of California, County of Fresno vs. Facebook, Inc. Attn: Facebook Security/LE Response Team 1601 Willow Road Menlo Park, CA 94025

Case Summary

On 04/13/2021 State of California, County of Fresno filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Facebook, Inc Attn Facebook Security/LE Response Team 1601 Willow Road Menlo Park, CA 94025. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Fresno Superior Courthouse Downtown located in Fresno, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Skiles, Jon M. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****2923

  • Filing Date:

    04/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Fresno Superior Courthouse Downtown

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judge

Skiles, Jon M

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

State of California, County of Fresno

Defendants

Facebook, Inc. Attn: Facebook Security/LE Response Team 1601 Willow Road Menlo Park, CA 94025

Facebook Account: blazine_

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketSearch Warrant Extended- Judicial Officer: Skiles, Jon M; Comment: Extension date: 02/22/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketTelephonic Search Warrant Issued and Filed- Judicial Officer: Skiles, Jon M; Comment: Date filed: 04/12/2021 Property Taken: Yes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketSearch Warrant and Affidavit Issued and Filed- Judicial Officer: Skiles, Jon M; Comment: Date of issuance: 12/28/2020 Property taken: Yes

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Facebook is a litigant