This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 04/27/2022 at 00:33:33 (UTC).

Stacey Journagan vs. California Forensic Medical Group, Incorporated

Case Summary

On 06/21/2021 Stacey Journagan filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against California Forensic Medical Group, Incorporated. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Fresno County BF Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Tharpe, D Tyler, Brickey, Gabriel and Gaab, Kimberly. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1771

  • Filing Date:

    06/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Tharpe, D Tyler

Brickey, Gabriel

Gaab, Kimberly

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Journagan, Stacey

Defendants

California Forensic Medical Group, Incorporated

Wellpath Management, Inc.

Ramirez, Terry

Silveira, Jamie

Silveira, Jaimie

Muro, Marie

Bekdache, Cynthia

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Saadian, Bobby

Defendant Attorney

Perkins, April A.

 

Court Documents

Civil Complaint filed

Complaint

Civil case cover sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice Filed

CV-48 Notice of Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for All Purposes; Comment: Notice of Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for All Purpose (emailed)

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Summons issued and filed

Summons

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Proof of Service - Muro

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Answer Filed

Answer/Response/Denial/Demurrer - First Appearance Fee

3/9/22 ADR Stipulation

03/09/2022: 3/9/22 ADR Stipulation

Minute Order Attachment

02/08/2022: Minute Order Attachment

1/25/22 - Request for Dismissal

01/25/2022: 1/25/22 - Request for Dismissal

2022 01-25 Case Management Statement.pdf

01/25/2022: 2022 01-25 Case Management Statement.pdf

12-2-21 Answer of Cynthia Bekdache's

12/02/2021: 12-2-21 Answer of Cynthia Bekdache's

Proof of Service

11/04/2021: Proof of Service

Proof of Service

10/19/2021: Proof of Service

Minute Order Attachment

10/19/2021: Minute Order Attachment

2021 10-4 CMS (Journagan).pdf

10/04/2021: 2021 10-4 CMS (Journagan).pdf

24 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/09/2023
  • DocketJury Trial; Judicial Officer: Gaab, Kimberly; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Comment: 5-7 Days

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2023
  • DocketTrial Readiness; Judicial Officer: Gaab, Kimberly; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2023
  • DocketMandatory Settlement Conference; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • DocketOSC - ADR Stipulation; Judicial Officer: Brickey, Gabriel; Hearing Time: 3:32 PM; Cancel Reason: Off Calendar

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADR Stipulation Mediation filed; Comment: Parties to engage in mediation. Mediator: Hon. Margaret Nagle

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • DocketJury Trial Requested by Both Parties; Comment: 5-8 Days

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinute Order Attachment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Brickey, Gabriel; Hearing Time: 3:30 PM; Result: Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment; Judgment Type: Dismissal of Party; Party; Name: Muro, Marie; Comment: Without prejudice

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal Received - Pending Review

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
36 More Docket Entries
  • 06/24/2021
  • DocketSummons and Complaint; Served: 06/23/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for Journagan, Stacey: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2021-38600 Journagan, Stacey $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for Journagan, Stacey: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • FinancialFinancial: Journagan, Stacey; Total Financial Assessment $585.00; Total Payments and Credits $585.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Filed; Comment: Notice of Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for All Purpose (emailed)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil case cover sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Complaint filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less